Wells et al v. Kone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Wells and Roger Wells
Defendant: Unknown Defendants of Kone, Inc., Unknown Defendants of Kone Elevators & Escalators of Louisville, Kone, Inc., Craig Lewis, Tony Dunsmore and Kone Elevators & Escalators of Louisville
Case Number: 5:2019cv00340
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Carolyn Wells, Roger Wells and Reply in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Kone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKenna, Sarah)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Shasta Mullins re #5 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Carolyn Wells, Roger Wells: Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Carolyn Wells, Roger Wells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Kone's Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Kone's Invoice, #3 Exhibit C -Answer to Request for Admissions #4 Exhibit D - KY Supreme Court case, #5 Exhibit E - Complaint - Fayette Circuit 19-CI-01538, #6 Exhibit F - Tony Dunsmore Answer to Request for Admissions #7 Exhibit G - Tony Dunsmore Answer to Complaint, #8 Proposed Order Remanding)(Mullins, Shasta) Modified to describe attachments on 9/25/2019 (GLD).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) Plts Roger and Carolyn Wells SHALL file any response to dft Kone, Inc.'s notice of removal #1 by 9/24/2019; (2) Dfts SHALL file any reply by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/10/2019.(STC)cc: COR
August 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kone, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kone Corporation for Kone, Inc. (SLH)
August 22, 2019 ANSWER of Tony Dunsmore to Plaintiff's Complaint. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE DE #1 (SLH)
August 22, 2019 ANSWER of Craig Lewis to Plaintiff's Complaint. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE DE #1 (SLH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01538. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4446261), filed by Kone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit KYSOS Business Searches, #3 Exhibit- Executed Affidavits, #4 Exhibit- NOS and Dft RFA & Interrog to Plt, #5 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. Kone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants of Kone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants of Kone Elevators & Escalators of Louisville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Mikowski McKenna
Represented By: Philip M. Longmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Dunsmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone Elevators & Escalators of Louisville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Wells
Represented By: Joshua James Mullins
Represented By: Shasta Kay Fraley Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Wells
Represented By: Joshua James Mullins
Represented By: Shasta Kay Fraley Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?