RSI, LLC v. Nationwide Insurance Company
Plaintiff: RSI, LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00341
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #8 Response to Motion, #11 Reply to Response to Motion (SLH)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC; MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice (SLH)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by RSI, LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JLM) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (JJ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by RSI, LLC re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JLM) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (JJ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC filed by Nationwide Insurance Company. (Banks, Darrin) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (JJ).
September 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC (JLM) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (JJ).
September 13, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Robert V. Jennings re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC. (JJ)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Robert V. Jennings re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC MOTION for Richard V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC; attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR, Richard V. Jennings via US Mail (JJ) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (JJ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by RSI, LLC, MOTION for Robert V. Jennings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RSI, LLC (JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #1 Receipt 5028349) (JJ). Modified text on 9/13/2019 (JJ).
September 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Nationwide Insurance Company (JLM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 THE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE TO THE COURT\DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Nationwide Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Bobbett v. Russellville Mobile Park, LLC)(Banks, Darrin)
September 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #5 Notice, (JJ)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court by RSI, LLC regarding service of Defendant's #4 Motion and attempt to find counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope Mailed to Plaintiff from Defendant's Counsel, #2 Exhibit Complaint filed in State Court)(JJ)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Nationwide Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A- COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B- BOBBETT V. RUSSELLVILLE MOBILE PARK, LLC, #4 Exhibit C- Watson v. United States Liability Insurance Co., #5 Proposed Order)(Banks, Darrin)
August 23, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
August 23, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RSI, LLC via Certified Mail to Nationwide Insurance Company. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE DE #1 (SLH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationwide Insurance Company. (SLH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-457. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4447805), filed by Nationwide Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Articles of Organization, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSI, LLC v. Nationwide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Represented By: Darrin Winn Banks
Represented By: Zachary M. Sosnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSI, LLC
Represented By: Robert V. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?