Wesley v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Misty Lynn Wesley
Defendant: Lexington Fayette Urban County Government and USA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00349
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Order by Misty Lynn Wesley, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Miscellaneous Attachments regarding SSA Benefits, #2 Cover Letter)(JJ)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) Wesley SHALL FILE in the record any notice, determination of appeal, or other outcome of her Social Security overpayment determination; 2) Wesley SHALL FILE in the record any notice, determination, or other outcome of her EEOC charges of discrimination, particularly as related to the timeliness of her charges against Lexington Civic Center and Surgical Care Affiliates and exhaustion of administrative remedies; 3) The Clerk SHALL SEAL Exhibits 2 and 3 to Wesley's Complaint; 4) Wesley SHALL FILE in the record redacted copies of Exhibits 2 and 3 to her Complaint; 5) Wesley SHALL NOTIFY the Court whether she has filed any action in any state or federal jurisdiction duplicative of the claims she makes in this matter; and 6) Wesley SHALL SUPPLEMENT the record as required herein NLT 10/1/2019, after which time this matter will stand submitted. 7) The Clerk SHALL SERVE a copy of this Order on Wesley by first-class mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 9/11/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Pltf Wesley via US Mail
August 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re #2 MOTION to proceed by Misty Lynn Wesley MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Misty Lynn Wesley (JJ)
August 30, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to proceed by Misty Lynn Wesley, MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Misty Lynn Wesley, pro se. Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Proceed with Civil Action, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Demand pursuant to 18:645 & 654, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter to SSA dated 5/27/19, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter to SSA dated 6/17/19, #5 Exhibit 4 - Article re SSA & DHS, #6 Exhibit 5 - Charge o Discrimination against Surgical Care Affiliates, #7 Exhibit 6 - Charge of Discrimination against Lexington Civic Center, #8 Exhibit 7 - Charge of Discrimination Robert Half International Incorporated, #9 Exhibit 8 - Letter to Lexington Civic Center dated 1/27/15, #10 Exhibit 9 - Article re John Calipari and Former President Barack Obama playing Golf, #11 Tendered Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #12 Tendered Proposed Order, #13 Tendered Motion for Attorney Representation, #14 Tendered Proposed Order for Attorney)(JJ) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (JJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #15 Cover Letter) (JJ).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 GENERAL ORDER 07-06: Misty Lynn Wesley is PERMANENTLY BARRED AND ENJOINED from: (a) filing any new civil action and (b) filing any additional pleadings in any of the seven cases which she has already filed in this Court, unless she firsts obtains a certification from a United States Magistrate Judge of EDKY that claims asserted are not frivolous and that filings(s) are not being submitted for any improper purpose. (JJ)cc: COR, Wesley via US mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Fayette Urban County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Lynn Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?