Quisenberry v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Quisenberry
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00353
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Danny C Reeves
2 Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Simpson, W.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER: It is ORDERED that this action is REASSIGNED to the Judge Joseph M. Hood for all further proceedings (KM)cc: COR
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURES by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosure Witnesses, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Expert Witnesses, #3 Exhibit C - Initial Disclosure Documents)(Simpson, W.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. NLT 10/21/2019 parties exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1); 2. NLT 2/14/2020, plaintiff disclose expert witnesses; NLT 3/13/2020, defendants disclose same; 3. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of discovery of new information, but NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; 5. Discovery due by 5/15/2020; 6. Discovery disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) by random draw; 7. All motions for extension of time referred to undersigned; 8. Parties may not by agreement extend any deadline in scheduling order or for motions; 9. Motions to amended pleadings & join additional parties due by 11/1/2019; 10. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2020; 11. Parties shall file by 9/25/2020 witness lists, exhibit lists, pretrial memorandum; 12. Parties shall pre-mark & number all exhibits & provide to opposing counsel by 10/2/2020; 12. Agreed Proposed Jury Instruction due by 10/9/2020; 14. Objections to depositions due 10/9/2020; 15. Pretrial filings may be submitted to chambers via email; 16. NLT 10/16/2020, parties submit exhibits to chambers; 17. JURY TRIAL set for 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, counsel to appear at 8:30 a.m. (3 weeks); 18. Parties directed to file joint status report the first Monday of each month; 19. Parties directed to used the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate dispute; 20. Motions tendered regarding Stipulated protective Orders, shall contain proposed orders that are tailored to the Rules & General Orders of this court & relevant to that particular stage of litigation.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/11/2019.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Case Management Order No. 12, #3 Exhibit C - Case Management Order No. 14, #4 Exhibit D - Case Management Order No. 21)(Simpson, W.)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days from the entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties; 2. At meeting, counsel shall exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e); 3. NLT 10 days after the meeting, counsel for parties shall file a joint written report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(KM)cc: COR
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Simpson, W.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Simpson, W.)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Notice of Removal) via Certified Mail to C.R. Bard, Inc. (Filed at DE #1 as part of the State Court Record). (KM)
September 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc. (KM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-2945. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4458688), filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quisenberry v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Quisenberry
Represented By: Thomas K. Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?