Brooks et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: John Brooks and Tamara Brooks
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv00360
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Submission of Records re Remanded Cases by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, John Brooks, Tamara Brooks, C.R. Bard, Inc. NOTE: Please see Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to this MDL. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2641 Master Case Docket Sheet)(CBD)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:18-cv-00162. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR Modified on 9/13/2019 (CBD).
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #4 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Tamara Brooks, John Brooks. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00162-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15061617 filed by Tamara Brooks, John Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brooks
Represented By: David J. Guarnieri
Represented By: Jason S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Brooks
Represented By: David J. Guarnieri
Represented By: Jason S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?