Mills v. Lane et al
Plaintiff: Joshua S. Mills
Defendant: Dakota Mitchell, Ben Lane, Bourbon County Detention Center and City of Paris
Case Number: 5:2019cv00374
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Mills's #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; 2. The Clerk of Court will mark the assigned case number on (a) and affidavit of assets/in forma pauperis application [Form AO-240]; and (b) a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY form 523] and send them to Mills; 3. Should Mills wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application, and (3) file both of these documents with this Court; and 4. Mills must take these steps within thirty (30) days, or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/17/2019.(KM)cc: COR, Mills with designated form via U.S. mail
September 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (KJR)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(MDC)
September 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00586. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Plt w/ copy of docket sheet
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division at Lexington, for all further proceedings 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). All future filings should be filed in that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court SHALL TRANSFER the filing to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/17/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter by Joshua S. Mills. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/17/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua S. Mills (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 9/17/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 9/17/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bourbon County Detention Center, City of Paris, Ben Lane, Dakota Mitchell, filed by Joshua S. Mills. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Envelope) (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 9/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bourbon County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?