Jackson v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Jackson
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00379
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days from this order, parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the meeting, counsel shall exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). 3. NLT 10 days after the meeting, counsel shall file a written joint report. This report shall conform to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Appendix Form 52. 4. In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, the party is directedto advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties' joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/14/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
November 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint (JJ)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Jackson, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Polaris Industries, Inc..(Jackson, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Polaris Industries, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Adam Jackson Summons (McClellan, Donald)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Donald K. McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; and 2. Donald K. McClellan is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/7/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, McClellan w/ECF Registration
September 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #3 MOTION for Donald K. McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Jackson (JJ)
September 18, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Donald K. McClellan re #3 MOTION for Donald K. McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Jackson. (JJ)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Donald K. McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Proposed Order)(JJ)
September 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 5028375), filed by Adam Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Receipt)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Jackson
Represented By: Donald K. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lyle Jackson
Represented By: Christopher Rennie Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?