Burns v. Kentucky Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: John Burns
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Case Number: 5:2019cv00383
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: (1) Burns' complaint is DISMISSED; (2) judgment entered in favor of dft; (3) action is DISMISSED & STRICKEN from the docket; (4) this is a final & appealable judgment. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/24/19.(KJR)cc: COR, Burns (US Mail)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) that Burns' complaint is DISMISSED; (2) this action is STRICKEN from the docket; (3) judgment shall be entered. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/24/19.(KJR)cc: COR, Burns (US Mail)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Burns' #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. Because of a lack of available assets, payment of an initial partial filing fee is DEFFERRED. 3. The Clerk shall open an account in Burn's name of receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form: (1) Burns' name, (2) his inmate registration number, and (3) this case number. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice ofPayment Form upon the warden of the institution in which Bums is currentlyconfined. 4. Burn's custodian shall send the Clerk a payment in an amount equal to 20% of Burns' income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. Burns must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/23/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Pltf via US Mail
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MDC)
September 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00657. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Plt w/ copy of docket sheet
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/18/2019 transferring case. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division, at Lexington pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel, pro se Plaintiff (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Burns by John Burns. (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Burns (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kentucky Department of Corrections filed by John Burns. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered, #2 Envelope) (ALS) [Transferred from kywd on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Kentucky Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?