Oliver et al v. Haney et al
Plaintiff: Erik Oliver, Eric Maxion and Alvin Thornton
Defendant: Steve Haney, Tammy Allen, Linda Smallwood, Rob Wilson and Steve Tussey
Case Number: 5:2019cv00389
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alvin Thornton re #7 Judgment, #6 Memorandum Opinion & Order. (JJ)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants. 2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/2/2019.(JJ)cc: Pltfs via US Mail
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1. Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 2. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. 3. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4. The Court will enter a corresponding Judgment. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/2/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Plaintiffs via US Mail (JJ).
September 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Order by Eric Maxion, Erik Oliver, Alvin Thornton (KJR)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order Pursuant to Rule 15 of FRCP to Amend Complaint by Eric Maxion, Erik Oliver, Alvin Thornton (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 env postmarked 9/24/19)(KJR)
September 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erik Oliver, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Maxion (JJ)
September 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erik Oliver, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 9/20/2019)(JJ)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Maxion, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JJ)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Erik Oliver, Alvin Thornton, Eric Maxion, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 9/20/2019)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver et al v. Haney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Maxion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?