Harris v. Eastern State Hospital
Plaintiff: Stephen Yonzal Harris
Defendant: Eastern State Hospital
Case Number: 5:2019cv00390
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stephen Yonzel Harris re #7 Order, #8 Judgment, (STC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1. Stephen Yonzal Harris's complaint #1 is DISMISSED; 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay.Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/8/19.(SLH)cc: COR, Plaintiff (US mail)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Harris's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED; 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. A corresponding Judgment shall be entered this date. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/8/19.(SLH)cc: COR, Plaintiff( US mail)
October 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #6 Letter (GLD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Stephen Yonzal Harris, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 10/3/19) (GLD)
October 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Stephen Yonzal Harris (STC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Stephen Yonzal Harris, pro se. (STC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 GRIEVANCE by Stephen Yonzal Harris, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9 30 2019)(STC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(STC)
September 24, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Stephen Yonzal Harris, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9 18 2019)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yonzal Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?