Downey v. USA
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00391
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101et
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. denying #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; 2. Within 28 days, Downey must either pay the $505.00 appellate filing fee to the Clerk of this Court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the Sixth Circuit. 3. The Sixth Circuit will dismiss the appeal for failure to prosecute if Downey does not comply. Perotti v. Wilkinson, 90 F. App'x 884, 886 (6th Cir. 2004). 4. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/18/19. (JLM)cc: COR,6CCA,Downey via U.S. mail.
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 19-6288 Case Manager Jill E. Colyer for #5 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark Downey. Filing fee with the U.S. District Court or IFP motion with 6CCA due by 11/29/19. (JJ)
November 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mark Downey (pro se) (SLH)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Mark Downey (pro se) Motions referred to P SO. (SLH) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (SLH).
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order by Mark Downey (pro se) cc: Pltf Downey with attested copy and docket sheet ( US mail), 6CCA (Attachments: #1 Letter from DC, #2 Previously filed complaint, #3 Envelope postmarked 10/22/19, #4 Letter from Northwest Center, #5 Duplicate filing of NOA)(SLH)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. Court GRANTS Downey's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; 2. Court DISMISSES Downey's complaint #1 for failure to adequately articulate a claim for relief; 3. Court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and the pauper status is denied should any appeal be taken; 4. This matter is STRICKEN from the active docket of the COURT.. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/1/19.(SLH)cc: COR
September 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (JLM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. Motions referred to P SO. (JLM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Mark Downey, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope postmarked 9/20/19)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?