Miller et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Larry Miller and Janice Miller
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 5:2019cv00399
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURES of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Almasalkhi, Aida)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST DISCLOSURES by Janice Miller.(Davis, Rodney)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) All discovery disputes are REFERRED to a magistrate judge, to be assigned by random draw (Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett). 2) The Court encourages early and economic case resolution including, where appropriate, by mediation. Parties SHALL immediately asses any potential resolution and continue as litigation continues. 3) Initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) by 11/22/2019. 4) All motion to amend pleadings and join additional parties due on or before 12/20/2019. 5) All discovery due on or before 1/17/2020. Supplementation shall be made on or before 1/31/2020.6) All dispositive motions due on or before 2/14/2020. 7) All motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. The parties are advised in advance that such motions are disfavored and must be accompanied by a memorandum and affidavit of counsel outlining sufficient grounds, including citations to relevant legal authority, for granting the relief sought. 8) The scope of discovery and the parties' obligations in discovery are governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 9) Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1. 10) Pretrial filings due at least 10 days before the final pretrial conference. 11) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. 12) JURY TRIAL set for 5/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/5/2019.(JJ)cc: COR,D,JC Modified text on 11/5/2019 (JJ).
November 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JJ)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Almasalkhi, Aida)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, parties shall meet to discuss nature of and basis of claims, arrange for disclosures, and to develop a proposed discovery plan. (2) Within 10 days, parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/15/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
October 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Answer to Complaint (JJ)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)(Almasalkhi, Aida)
September 27, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachussetts Holding Inc, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (MDC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Estill Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-191. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4476238), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Miller
Represented By: Rodney Garrett Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Miller
Represented By: Rodney Garrett Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Aida Almasalkhi
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?