Scott v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lord Vincent Scott
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00412
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, inc.; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is not just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc's #4 MOTION for summary judgment is GRANTED and its motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot; 2. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. with respect to the claim presented in this civil action; 3. Plaintiff Scott's KCRA claim for wrongful discharge is DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. This action will be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/13/2019.(KM)cc: COR
November 5, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (JLM)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Endlish, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exh. A - Employee Separation Form, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Determination, #5 Proposed Order)(Cornell, Laurel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (JJ)
October 7, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-3300. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4483634), filed by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Vincent Scott
Represented By: Christian L. Torp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Laurel K. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?