Nursing CE Central, LLC v. CE Resource Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nursing CE Central, LLC
Defendant: Erin K. Meinyer, CE Resource Inc. and Dennis R. Meinyer
Case Number: 5:2019cv00413
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by CE Resource Inc. to Transfer to the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division or MOTION to Stay by CE Resource Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Campbell Declaration, #3 Exhibit B: Kern Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Edward) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (KM).
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by CE Resource Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CE Resource Inc.. (O'Brien, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VIRTUAL ORDER: Dft's #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED IN PART. Dft is given until 12/05/2019 to respond the Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/21/2019. (MDC) cc: COR
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nursing CE Central, LLC. Amendment to #15 Response to Motion . (Francis, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CE Resource Inc. (Unopposed) filed by Nursing CE Central, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James M. Francis)(Francis, James)
November 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CE Resource Inc. (Unopposed) (KM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Edward O'Brien. #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CE Resource Inc. (Unopposed) has been filed by CE Resource, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CE Resource Inc. (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Holtzman, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Edward)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED by Nursing CE Central, LLC: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Erin K. Meinyer COMPLETED on 11/5/2019. Secretary of State return states served on 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(KM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED by Nursing CE Central, LLC: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Dennis R. Meinyer COMPLETED on 11/5/2019. Secretary of State return states served on 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(KM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED by Nursing CE Central, LLC: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to CE Resource Inc. COMPLETED on 11/5/2019. Secretary of State return states served on 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(KM)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's claims agains Defendant Dennis Meinyer & Erin Meinyer are DISMISSED without prejudice; 2. The plaintiff's claims against Defendant CE Resource, Inc. remain pending. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/28/2019.(KM)cc: COR
October 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Nursing CE Central, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dennis R. Meinyer, Erin K. Meinyer, Nursing CE Central, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dennis R Meinyer, #2 Summons Erin K. Meinyer) (MDC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nursing CE Central, LLC of the filing of summons (Attachments: #1 Summons CE Resources, #2 Summons DM, #3 Summons EM)(Francis, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nursing CE Central, LLC. (Francis, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (KM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James Francis. #1 Complaint has been filed by Nursing CE Central, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
October 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4484332), filed by Nursing CE Central, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Coursework, #2 Exhibit B - CER's Coursework, #3 Exhibit C - Everhart Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Cease & Desist Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Response to Cease & Desist Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Letter to Everhart, #7 Exhibit G - Everhart's Letter to Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit H - Everhart's Letter to CER, #9 Exhibit I - CER's Letter to KBN, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nursing CE Central, LLC v. CE Resource Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin K. Meinyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CE Resource Inc.
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis R. Meinyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nursing CE Central, LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?