Reynolds v. Keeneland Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rickey L. Reynolds
Defendant: Keeneland Association, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00429
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Rickey L. Reynolds filed by Keeneland Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muyskens, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Rickey L. Reynolds filed by Keeneland Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muyskens, Elizabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Rickey L. Reynolds re #5 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Rickey L. Reynolds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Complaint)(Torp, Christian)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Christian Torp re #5 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct; attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (JJ)
November 24, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Rickey L. Reynolds (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Torp, Christian)
November 24, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Rickey L. Reynolds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Torp, Christian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (JJ).
October 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (JJ)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Keeneland Association, Inc.. (JJ)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keeneland Association, Inc. (JJ)
October 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-03555. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4504359), filed by Keeneland Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Keeneland Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeneland Association, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Griffith
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Muyskens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey L. Reynolds
Represented By: Christian L. Torp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?