Naylor v. SSA
Plaintiff: Deborah Naylor
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00444
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed via Certified Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 11/19/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail on 11/18/2019; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 US Atty Office, #2 US Atty General)(MDC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA; Summons issued and delivered to US Marshal for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Office of Gen Counsel, #2 Summons US Atty General)(MDC) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (MDC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #3 Summons USM Time Stamp) (MDC).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pla's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/12/2019. (MDC) cc: COR
November 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Naylor (MDC)
November 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Naylor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MDC)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Deborah Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Atty, #2 Summons Office of Gen Counsel, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naylor v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Naylor
Represented By: Stacey Hardin Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?