Skinner v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nelda Skinner
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00472
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (JLM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Pope, Susan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson filed by Nelda Skinner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UK Op Report 10-17-18, #2 Exhibit UK Op Report 11-10-18, #3 Exhibit Ethicon Med Device Recall, #4 Exhibit Affidavit (Skinner))(Herren, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint in Quisenberry v. C.R. Bard, #3 Proposed Order)(Pope, Susan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (JLM)
December 5, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-758. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4537539), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda Skinner
Represented By: Thomas K. Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Jacinta F. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Jacinta F. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?