Harris et al v. B&L Delivery LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pablo Mata and Tyler Harris
Defendant: Bob Maynard and B&L Delivery LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00029
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #8 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint (JJ)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint by B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Williams, John)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint by B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Williams, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2020: #3 Exhibit Employee Acknowledgement Harris, #4 Exhibit Employee Acknowledgement Mata) (JJ).
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard.(Williams, John)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including 3/26/2020 within which to file its responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/17/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B&L Delivery LLC. (Williams, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Williams, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS by Tyler Harris, Pablo Mata . Answer due 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - B&L Delivery LLC, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service - Bob Maynard)(Lockaby, Matthew) Modified text on 2/21/2020 (JJ). Modified on 2/21/2020 (JJ).
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to B&L Delivery LLC, Bob Maynard; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Bob Maynard)(JJ)
January 28, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4579236), filed by Pablo Mata, Tyler Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons B&L DeliveryLLC, #3 Summons Bob Maynard)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. B&L Delivery LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Mata
Represented By: Tamara Patterson
Represented By: Matthew T. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Harris
Represented By: Tamara Patterson
Represented By: Matthew T. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Maynard
Represented By: John M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&L Delivery LLC
Represented By: John M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?