Tillman v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Penny Tillman
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Titus Transport Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00076
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.(Wahlheim, William)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Wahlheim, William)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint; Defendants' responsive pleading deadline is 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 3/26/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Stipulation and Agreed Order)(Wahlheim, William)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC, filed by Penny Tillman, Penny Tillman.(Hagerman, Bartley)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER: re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant's responsive pleading deadline be extended to March 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 3/6/20. (JLM)cc: COR
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Stipulation and Agreed Order)(Wahlheim, William)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendant's #8 Motion for William B. Wihleim to Appear Pro Hac Vice & #9 Motion for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 3/5/2020. (JJ)cc: COR
March 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re #9 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4612324), #8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4612316) (JJ)
March 5, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to William B. Wahlheim, Jr, Braxton S. Thrash re #9 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC , #8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC . (JJ)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO William B. Wahlheim, Jr. & Braxton S. Thrush re #8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice & #9 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4612324)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Thrash, Braxton)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4612316)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NEAT Transportation Group for Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.. (Wahlheim, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Wahlheim, William)
March 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs).. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier.(JJ)cc: COR
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William B. Wahlheim, Jr. & Braxton S. Thrush. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company & Titus Transport Holdings, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Co. Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00064. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4609941), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Titus Transport Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents - MetLife, #2 Exhibit B State Court Documents - Titus, #3 Exhibit C Certificate of Insurance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Tillman
Represented By: Bartley K. Hagerman
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titus Transport Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?