Thomas v. SSA
Plaintiff: Bobby S. Thomas
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00095
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby S. Thomas via certified mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 3/26/2020. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via certified mail on 3/24/20; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via certified mail on 3/30/20. (KJR)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (JJ)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/16/2020. (JJ)cc: COR
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby S. Thomas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(SLH)
March 13, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Bobby S. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM 285, #3 Summons - SSA, #4 Summons - USA, #5 Summons USAG)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby S. Thomas
Represented By: Wolodymyr Cybriwsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?