Leaks v. Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerome Leaks
Defendant: Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00139
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 Response in Opposition to Motion (JJ)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand by Jerome Leaks filed by Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order denying Motion to Remand)(Miller, Wendy)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant shall, NLT 5/27/2020, either RESPOND to Plaintiff's #4 MOTION to Remand or SHOW CAUSE as to why it has failed to respond to the motion. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/18/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
April 29, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #4 MOTION to Remand by Jerome Leaks (JJ)
April 17, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #3 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No response. (JJ)
April 10, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, (JJ)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc..(Miller, Wendy)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Jerome Leaks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scharfenberger, Kurt)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Wendy V. Miller. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ)
April 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyle Co. Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00072. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4636291), filed by Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Annual Report Online Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leaks v. Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelligrated Systems Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy V. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Leaks
Represented By: Kurt A. Scharfenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?