Williams v. Ferguson et al
Plaintiff: Rodger Williams and Willow Williams
Defendant: Nurse Betsy, Jann Eddington, Brad Adams, President of WellPath, Dr. Clifford, Ferguson, Dr. Meeks and Allyson Ranwater
Case Number: 5:2020cv00239
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is ORDERED that, to the extent that this Plaintiff is seeking further relief from this Court (DE #14 , #15 ), that request is DENIED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/24/2020.(JJ)cc: Rodger Williams by US Mail
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit by Rodger Williams, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 6/11/2020)(JJ)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Rodger Williams, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post mark illegible, #2 Exhibit Disciplinary Hearing, #3 Exhibit Announcement, #4 Exhibit Email) (JJ)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's claims for money damages against the various defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. Williams's claims for injunctive relief against the various defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED without prejudice to her right to file a new complaint regarding these claims. 3. Williams's claims against any of the defendants in their individual capacities are also DISMISSED without prejudice to her right to file a new complaint regarding these claims. 4.This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 5.This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/10/2020.(JJ)cc: COR and Rodger Williams by US Mail
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Williams's claims for money damages against the various defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. Williams's claims for injunctive relief against the various defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED without prejudice to her right to file a new complaint regarding these claims, as discussed above. 3. Williams's claims against any of the defendants in their individual capacities are also DISMISSED without prejudice to her right to file a new complaint regarding these claims, as is also discussed above. 4.This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 5. Any and all pending motions are DENIED as moot. 6. The Court will enter a corresponding Judgment. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/10/2020.(JJ)cc: COR and Rodger Williams by US Mail
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer w/ copy of docket sheet via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
June 3, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (TDA)
June 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: Case Transferred In from District of Kentucky Western. (TDA)
June 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:20-cv-00369. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Williams w/ docket sheet via US Mail.
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/3/2020 - The claims brought against Defendants NTC Warden Brad Adams, Dr. Clifford, Jann Eddington, and Allyson Ranwater, as well as the claims brought against Defendants Dr. Meeks and the President of Wellpath based upon events that allegedly occurred at NTC, are SEVERED from this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Lexington Division. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer Plaintiff's pending motion for a preliminary injunction (DN #5 ) to the Eastern District of Kentucky since it is related to Plaintiff's incarceration at NTC. cc: Plaintiff, Defendants (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) by Judge David J. Hale on 6/2/2020, granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, Finance, Northpoint Training Center (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: No Summons tendered with Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/29/2020. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Rodger Williams (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rodger Williams. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rodger Williams (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brad Adams, Clifford, Jann Eddington, Ferguson, Meeks, Nurse Betsy, President of WellPath, filed by Rodger Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 USM 285 #15 Declarations) (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 6/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willow Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Betsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jann Eddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of WellPath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyson Ranwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?