Massey v. Defendants
Plaintiff: Antonio Thomas Massey
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 5:2020cv00262
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Antonio Thomas Massey re #4 Letter : The Clerk of Court cannot provide legal advice. You may prepare a motion requesting the relief sought to be filed in your case. cc: Antonio Thomas Massey by US Mail. (MDC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Antonio Massey requesting advice about what to do next in his case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 07/03/2020) (MDC)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for administrative purposes. 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/22/2020.(GLD)cc: COR and Massey by US Mail
June 19, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred). No filing fee and no IFP motion submitted. (JLM)
June 19, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Antonio Thomas Massey, pro se. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 6-15-20)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Thomas Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?