Raymer v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Hanna Raymer
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2020cv00323
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(STC)
July 28, 2020 Conflict Check run. (STC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:20-cv-00332. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: Petitioner w/ copy of docket sheet
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/27/2020. The instant action filed pursuant to 28:2241 is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division, at Lexington pursuant to 28:1631. All further filings shall be filed at that Court.cc:Petitioner, pro se; Respondent; KYED (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 7/28/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 7/28/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Hanna Raymer. (KD) [Transferred from kywd on 7/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymer v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hanna Raymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?