USA v. $27,699.76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX5852 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $27,699.76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX5852, $521.95 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX8712 and $3,454,76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX1902
Claimant: George N. Ibe and Patricia Ibe
Case Number: 5:2020cv00353
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #12 Claim, #11 Answer to Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Claim (KM)
September 16, 2020 Clerk's Note A copy of the #9 Standing Order re: Disclosure of Contact Information and #10 Important Notice to Pro Se Filer was mailed to Claimant George N. Ibe. (KM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CLAIM filed by George N. Ibe, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/12/2020)(KM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture filed by George N. Ibe, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/12/2020)(KM)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KM)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell.(KM)cc: CORand Patricia Ibe by US Mail
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Claim by Patricia Ibe, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/11/2020)(KM)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Patricia Ibe, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope postmarked 9/11/2020)(KM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 U.S. Marshal Process Receipt & Return re #5 Warrant in Rem: $27,699.76; $3,454.76; and $521.95 in USMS custody as of 6/25/19. (KM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Warrant in Rem Issued as to $27,699.76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX5852, $3,454,76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX1902, $521.95 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX8712; original & 4 certified copies delivered to USM (KM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 USM Receipt) (KM).
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Warrant of Arrest In Rem by USA (Attachments: #1 Tendered Warrant)(KM) Modified on 8/18/2020 (KM).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by USA: related to USA v $27,699.76, case no. 5: 19-cv-423-GFVT. (KM) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (KM).
August 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Agent Alfred Burney, Jr., #2 Affidavit of Agent Alfred Burney, Jr., #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $27,699.76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX5852 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,699.76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX5852
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $521.95 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX8712
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,454,76 Seized from Citizens Bank Account # XXXXXX1902
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Haley Trogdlen McCauley, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George N. Ibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia Ibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?