Ashbrook v. Meijer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wilma Jean Ashbrook
Defendant: Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Case Number: 5:2020cv00356
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. By 10/12/2020, parties exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1); 2. NLT 2/12/2021, plaintiff shall disclose expert witnesses, NLT 3/12/2021, defendant disclose same; 3. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of the discovery of new information, but by NLT 30 days prior to the close of discovery; 4. Discovery due by 5/14/2021; 5. Each party limited to 30 interrogatories, 50 requests for production, and 25 requests for admissions. Plaintiff may take a maximum of 15 deposition. Defendants may take a total of 15 depositions. Each deposition shall be limited to a maximum of 15 hours; 6. Discover disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Stinnett; 7. All motions for extensions of time referred to undersigned for disposition; 8. Parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines set forth in his Schedule Order or deadlines for responding to motions; 9. NLT 4/2/2021 parties file motion to amend pleadings & join additional parties; 10. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2021; 11. The Court declines to schedule a Pretrial Conference at this time; 12. By 8/27/2021, counsel shall file: a. witness lists, b. exhibits lists, c. pretrial memorandum; 13. By 8/27/2021, counsel pre-mark & number all exhibits & provide copies to opposing counsel; 14. Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions due 9/13/2021; 15. Objections to use of depositions or to admissibility of exhibits due 9/3/2021; 16. Pretrial filings may be submitted to chambers by email listed; 17. NLT 9/10/2021 copies of exhibits submitted to chambers; 18. JURY TRIAL set for 9/21/2021 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m. (3 days). 19. The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month; 20. The parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/25/2020.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
September 25, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gray, Lindsay)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. The parties' construed motion [Record No. #5 ] is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff Wilma Jean Ashbrook's claims against Defendant Meijer, Inc., are DISMISSED, with prejudice, with the parties to bear their respective costs. 3. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership is substituted as a defendant, and the casecaption shall be amended accordingly. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/10/2020.(JJ)cc: COR
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order Substitute and Amend Case Caption by Meijer, Inc.. (Gray, Lindsay)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 30 days parties shall conduct the meeting required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the meeting, parties shall exchange initial disclosures. 3. NLT 10 days after the meeting, counsel shall file a written joint report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JJ)cc: COR
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meijer, Inc. (JJ)
August 19, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Meijer, Inc. Please see DE #1 -3 for pdf of document. (JJ)
August 19, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Co. Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-01654. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4752716), filed by Meijer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Resoponses to Requests for Admissions, #2 Exhibit Corporate Documents, #3 State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashbrook v. Meijer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Jean Ashbrook
Represented By: Thomas K. Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Piekarski
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christopher Piekarski
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?