United American Supply. LLC v. Vila Beauty Resources, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United American Supply. LLC
Defendant: Vila Beauty Resources, LLC and Diem Nguyen
Case Number: 5:2020cv00357
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Diem Nguyen on 9/26/20, filed by United American Supply. LLC. (Smith, Zackary)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Diem Ngoc Thi Nguyen on 9/26/2020, filed by United American Supply. LLC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by United American Supply. LLC via Personal Service to Vila Beauty Resources, LLC served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Smith, Zackary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Diem Nguyen, Vila Beauty Resources, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Pursuant to Order #11 ). (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JLM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1. granting #10 Motion for Issuance of Summonses; and 2. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to issue summonses to be served on the following Defendants: (1) Diem Nguyen and (2) Vila Beauty Resources, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/16/20. (JLM)cc: COR
September 11, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION for Issuance of Summonses by United American Supply. LLC (MDC)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Summonses by United American Supply. LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Zackary)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) Pla's #5 Motion for Erika N. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Erika N. Reynolds is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Pla in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 08/25/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Erika Reynolds by US Mail ( Order + Atty Registration Form)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) Pla's #4 Motion for Zachary G. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; 2) Zachary G. Smith is ADMITTED Pro hac Vice as counsel for Pla in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 08/25/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Zackary G. Smith by US Mail ( Order + Atty Registration Form)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United American Supply. LLC. (Schuette, Scott)
August 24, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #5 MOTION for Erika N. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC & #4 MOTION for Zackary G. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC (MDC)
August 24, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Erika Reynolds and Zackary G. Smith re #5 MOTION for Erika N. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply LLC and #4 MOTION for Zackary G. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply, LLC . (MDC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by United American Supply. LLC re #5 MOTION for Erika N. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4754551), #4 MOTION for Zackary G. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4754541) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re: Smith, #2 Exhibit Order re: Reynolds)(Schuette, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Erika N. Reynolds to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4754551) (Schuette, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Zackary G. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United American Supply. LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4754541) (Schuette, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Zackary G. Smith, Erika Reynolds. #1 Complaint, has been filed by United American Supply, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4752810), filed by United American Supply. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit UAS's wire, #3 Exhibit Sales Agreement, #4 Exhibit UAS's wire, #5 Exhibit Sales Agreement, #6 Exhibit UAS's wire)(SLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United American Supply. LLC v. Vila Beauty Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vila Beauty Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diem Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United American Supply. LLC
Represented By: Zackary G. Smith
Represented By: Erika Reynolds
Represented By: Scott A. Schuette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?