Johnson v. Quintana et al
Plaintiff: Carlton B. Johnson
Defendant: Francisco Quintana, McDaniel Mathew, Christopher Gomez, Tiara Cimorossa, Bryant Anyhony, Rhonda Jones, Melendez Rosa Myriam, Carrie Cunnagin and Bryant Anthony
Case Number: 5:2020cv00358
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time by Carlton B. Johnson, #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carlton B. Johnson, ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #13 Complaint (Referred) (GLD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carlton B. Johnson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support Of Motion For Appointment of Counsel, #2 Memorandum in Support)(GLD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 COMPLAINT (EDKY 520), filed by Carlton B. Johnson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Continuation of claim, #2 Official Notice of filing Multiple Claims and Multiple Defendants In Relations to Civil Rights Complaint)(GLD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time For Court Order Within the Time Allotted (30 days) for AO 240 form and EDKY 523 form by Carlton B. Johnson, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 10/2/2020)(GLD)
October 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #11 MOTION to have the Court to send "Certificate of Inmate Account" Form EDKy 523 to Allenwood USP Trust Fund Supervisor by Carlton B. Johnson, #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton B. Johnson (KM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to have the Court to send "Certificate of Inmate Account" Form EDKy 523 to Allenwood USP Trust Fund Supervisor by Carlton B. Johnson, pro se.Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Inmate Account Form, #2 Envelope dated 10/2/2020)(KM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton B. Johnson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope date 10/2/2020)(KM)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Johnson's current #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice; 2. The Clerk's Office shall send Johnson the following blank forms: a. Civil Rights Complaint Form; b. Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; and c. Certificate of Inmate Account; 3. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Johnson must complete the court-approved Civil Rights Complaint Form and file it with this Court; 4. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Johnson must also either pay the $400 in filing & administrative fees up front and full, or he must properly ask to pay the filing fee in installments over time completing & filing both the AO 240 and EDKY 523 Forms; 5. Since Johnson has not yet properly initiated this civil action, his preliminary motions #4 , #5 , #8 are also DENIED without prejudice; 6. Finally, Johnson must keep the Clerk's Office of a change in his address, the Court will dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020.(KM)cc: CORand Carlton Johnson by US Mail
August 21, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Referred) by Carlton B. Johnson. (KJR)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Referred) by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 copy of original complaint, #2 env postmark illegible)(KJR)
August 20, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #5 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Carlton B. Johnson, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carlton B. Johnson, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton B. Johnson (KJR)
August 20, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Multiple Claims by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). (KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend The Names of John/Jane Doe by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support, #2 Memorandum in Support)(KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). (KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (KJR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Carlton B. Johnson (pro se). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit administrative remedy documents, #2 env no postmark)(KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Quintana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniel Mathew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiara Cimorossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Anyhony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melendez Rosa Myriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?