Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company v. Wells Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Dana Little, Robert Little, Wells Construction, LLC, Lee Little and Carly Little
Case Number: 5:2020cv00372
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent STRICKLAND INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate Auto Owners Insurance for Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company.. (Vose, Leslie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Carly Little, Dana Little, Lee Little, Robert Little, Wells Construction, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(JLM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carly Little, Dana Little, Lee Little, Robert Little, Wells Construction, LLC, filed by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Fasttrack Search, #2 Exhibit B-Annual Report Online Filing, #3 Exhibit C-PVA of Paul Wells, #4 Exhibit D-Complaint from State Court, #5 Exhibit E-Certified Insurance Policy)(Filed per Order, DE #7 .(JLM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Response to Order to Show Cause. 1. Plaintiff Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company's request to file an Amended Complaint [Record No. #5 ] is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint [Record No. #5 -2] tendered by the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/11/20.(JLM)cc: COR
September 11, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #5 Response to Order to Show Cause (JLM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons Carly Little, #2 Summons Dana Little, #3 Summons Lee Little, #4 Summons Robert Little, #5 Summons Wells Construction)(Vose, Leslie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company #4 filed by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Attachment Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - Fasttrack Search, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Annual Report Online Filing, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - PVA of Paul Wells, #6 Exhibit Ex. D - Complaint from State Court, #7 Exhibit Ex. E - Certified Insurance Policy, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vose, Leslie)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company is DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE on or before September 10, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to properly allege diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/3/20.(JLM)cc: COR
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Error 1: RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Leslie Vose has been filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. Error 2: re #1 [Complaint]; attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 20-99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (JLM)
September 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4765860), filed by Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company v. Wells Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carly Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dominic Joseph Donovan
Represented By: Leslie Patterson Vose
Represented By: Erin Celeste Sammons Izzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?