Colombe v. SGN, INC.
Plaintiff: Angela Smith Colombe
Defendant: SGN, INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00374
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. (MDC)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Anthony J. Caruso re #7 Response in Support of re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to state a claim. Error: the reply to #5 Motion to Dismiss was incorrectly filed using the event Response in Support. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of #7 to state, incorrectly filed. Clerk filed the reply as #8 ; In the future, contact the ECF help desk when assistance is needed to select the correct event. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR(MDC)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (** FILED PURSUANT TO QC RE DE#7 .) (MDC)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 ** INCORRECTLY FILED - See DE #8 for Correct Entry. ** RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony) Modified Text on 9/29/2020 (MDC).
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. filed by Angela Smith Colombe. (Meyman, Henrietta)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by SGN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Caruso, Anthony)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by SGN, INC.. (Caruso, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4766795), filed by SGN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Docket)(SLH) Modified on 9/4/2020 (STC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colombe v. SGN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Smith Colombe
Represented By: Henrietta Gera Meyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGN, INC.
Represented By: Anthony J. Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?