Lynn v. Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Lynn
Defendant: Spectra Energy Corp., NDT Systems & Services (America), Inc., Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, NDT Global, LLC, Unknown Corporate Defendants, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC, Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Michael B. Clem and Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s)
Case Number: 5:2020cv00377
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Robinson, D.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, D. Christopher Robinson, Allison W. Weyand, Liam E. Felsen, Steven M. Crawford. A #17 Response to Motion, has been filed by Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC; Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC; Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC; Spectra Energy Corp. ; Enbridge (U.S.) Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MDC)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand by Jerry L. Lynn filed by Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Fire Dept. Records, #4 Proposed Order)(Robinson, D.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC filed by Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NDT America's Certificate of Dissolution & Termination, #2 Exhibit 2 - PHMSA Second Amended Corrective Order)(Robinson, D.)
October 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Christopher James Tucker re #15 Response to Motion: Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (MDC)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC filed by Jerry L. Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Order on Case 5:20-cv-96-JMH)(Tucker, Christopher) Modified text to describe attachments on 10/21/2020 (MDC).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Upon agreement by the Judges, and effective immediately, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter be reassigned to the Honorable Joseph M. Hood for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/09/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Jerry L. Lynn (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Tucker, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC. (Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC. (Ramsey, Ian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Michael B. Clem.(Jones, Ernest)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.(Robinson, D.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case by random draw to another Judge accepting cases on the Lexington docket pursuant to the Gen. Order governing case assignment. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 09/08/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT re #2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk. Correct document attached to this entry and also at DE #2 . cc: COR (MDC)
September 4, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP identifying Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Enbridge Inc. for Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.. (MDC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/4/2020) (SKV).
September 4, 2020 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael B. Clem, Enbridge (U.S.) Inc., NDT Global, LLC, NDT Services & Systems, LLC, NDT Systems & Services (America), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, Unknown Corporate Defendants, Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s), filed by Jerry L. Lynn. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (MDC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-193. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4768306), filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lynn State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kelly Gray, #3 Exhibit C - Delaware Certificate of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit D - Termination of Registration, #5 Exhibit E - Consent for Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Corp.
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Systems & Services (America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Global, LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corporate Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Services & Systems, LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Clem
Represented By: Ernest H. Jones, II
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Lynn
Represented By: Christopher James Tucker
Represented By: James Hadden Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?