Workman et al vs Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Plaintiff: L.M., O.M., J.M., C.M., Billy Griffin, G.M., Charles M. Workman, Tina Cox, Sara Ebert and Stephanie Moore
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP, Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s), NDT Global LLC, Spectra Energy Corp., NDT Systems & Services (America) Inc., Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC and Enbridge (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00396
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC (JJ)
November 19, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #10 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles M. Workman (JJ)
November 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brian Bailey re #16 REPLY BRIEF; Error: a link was not created to the related document. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create the link; In the future, create a link to the related document. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF to Defendant's #15 response to #10 motion to remand and to add a party defendant filed by C.M., Tina Cox, Sara Ebert, G.M., Billy Griffin, J.M., L.M., Stephanie Moore, O.M., Charles M. Workman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bailey, Brian) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (JJ).
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles M. Workman filed by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NTSB Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit B - Boyle Co Fire Dept Report, #3 Proposed Order)(Robinson, D.)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The #13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The time for NDT Global to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss is extended to 14 days after entry of an orderfrom this Court denying the pending motion to remand, if such order is entered. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/06/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
November 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response to #10 Motion, by NDT Global LLC (JJ)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response to #10 Motion, by NDT Global LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order of Extension)(Bentley, Frederick) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (JJ).
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC filed by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NDT America's Certificate of Dissolution & Termination, #2 Exhibit 2 - PHMSA Second Amended Corrective Order)(Robinson, D.)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC filed by C.M., Tina Cox, Sara Ebert, G.M., Billy Griffin, J.M., L.M., Stephanie Moore, O.M., Charles M. Workman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit letter from C Robinson, #2 Exhibit Order in Dolen Matter)(Bailey, Brian)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles M. Workman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC. (Ramsey, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by NDT Global LLC, NDT Systems & Services LLC. (Ramsey, Ian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.(Robinson, D.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case to the Honorable Joseph M. Hood, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky pursuant to the General Order governing case assignment. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/25/20.(JLM)cc: COR
September 25, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP identifying Other Affiliate Enbridge Inc. for Spectra Energy Corp., Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.. (JLM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-201. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4784381), filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Workman State Court File, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Kelly Gray, #3 Exhibit C-Delaware Certificate of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit D-Termination of Registration, #5 Exhibit E-Consent for Removal, #6 Exhibit F-Stipulation re Amount in Controversy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman et al vs Texas Eastern Transmission, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.M.
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Griffin
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Workman
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Cox
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ebert
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Moore
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Patrick Spencer McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Systems & Services LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Danville Compressor Station Operator(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Global LLC
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Corp.
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDT Systems & Services (America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?