Walker et al v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
Defendant: Dargavell, Jamie Wynn, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Jessica ., Washington, Deanna Anglin, Madison County, KY, Kandi Ginn and Leslie Steenbergen
Executor: Antonyus Walker, Marquesha Walker, Jozlynne Walker and Rontaveus Walker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00397
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Attorney Sarah Gelsomino shall SHOW CAUSE for her failure to comply w/ LR 83. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/18/2020.(SLH)cc: COR and Gelsomino by US Mail
November 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #7 Notice to Attorney Sarah Gelsomino. *CLERK'S NOTE: None Admission has been filed. (MDC)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VIRTUAL ORDER: Court GRANTS parties' #15 Proposed Agreed Order. The time within which the Plas may respond to the pending #13 Motion to Dismiss is extended through 11/24/2020. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/04/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time For Plaintiffs To Respond To Motion To Dismiss by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marquesha Walker, Antonyus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Rontaveus Walker. Deanna Anglin waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020; Dargavell waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020; Jamie Wynn waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Note: re #3 Notice to Attorney re Charles David Ewing: clerk received a call today from Mr. Ewing's assistant stating that she has mailed his Attorney Admission paperwork to the clerk's office. (KJR)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jessica., Kandi Ginn, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Leslie Steenbergen, Washington (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Margaret)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #11 Motion to Jacqueline Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/19/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Jacqueline Greene by US Mail (Order + Atty Registration Form)
October 19, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jacqueline Greene re #11 MOTION for Jacqueline Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4803872). (MDC)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Jacqueline Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4803872) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacqueline Greene Certificate Of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: ORDERED that the #8 & #9 Motion for Gary Franke and Michael O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/05/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
October 5, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Michael O'Neill re #9 MOTION for Michael O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4792306). (MDC)
October 5, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Gary F. Franke re #8 MOTION for Gary Franke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4792300). (MDC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Michael O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4792306) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mike O'Neill Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Gary Franke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonyus Walker, Rontaveus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Marquesha Walker ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4792300) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gary Franke Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Gerhardstein, Alphonse)
September 28, 2020 Case no longer referred to P SO. **Per Chambers/PSO agreement. (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sarah Gelsomino by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Michael O'Neill by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jacqueline Greene by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Gary F. Franke by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Charles David Ewing by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4784618), filed by Marquesha Walker, Antonyus Walker, Jozlynne Walker, Rontaveus Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Antonyus Walker
Represented By: Jacqueline Greene
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: Michael O'Neill
Represented By: Sarah Gelsomino
Represented By: Gary F. Franke
Represented By: Charles David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Marquesha Walker
Represented By: Jacqueline Greene
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: Michael O'Neill
Represented By: Sarah Gelsomino
Represented By: Gary F. Franke
Represented By: Charles David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jozlynne Walker
Represented By: Jacqueline Greene
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: Michael O'Neill
Represented By: Sarah Gelsomino
Represented By: Gary F. Franke
Represented By: Charles David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Rontaveus Walker
Represented By: Jacqueline Greene
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: Michael O'Neill
Represented By: Sarah Gelsomino
Represented By: Gary F. Franke
Represented By: Charles David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dargavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica .
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandi Ginn
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Steenbergen
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?