Johnson et al v. Hui Huliau Staffing et al
Plaintiff: Steven Johnson and Brian Eschrich
Defendant: Hui Huliau Staffing, 4P Management Company and Kaya Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00440
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brian Eschrich, Steven Johnson , #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brian Eschrich, Steven Johnson filed by 4P Management Company. (Cunningham, Chase)
November 30, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 4P Management Company (KM)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 4P Management Company filed by 4P Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Howard Russell Affidavit)(Klimkina, Alina)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Eschrich, Steven Johnson. (O'Toole, James) Modified on 12/23/2020 (GLD).
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brian Eschrich, Steven Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Toole, James)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brian Eschrich, Steven Johnson (O'Toole, James)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 4P Management Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klimkina, Alina)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 4P Management Company. (Klimkina, Alina)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Alina Klimkina. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by 4P Management Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD)
October 26, 2020 Conflict Check run. (GLD)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jessamine Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00388. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4809654), filed by 4P Management Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record - Notice of Filing Removal)(GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Hui Huliau Staffing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Huliau Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4P Management Company
Represented By: Chase M. Cunningham
Represented By: Alina Klimkina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaya Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Johnson
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Eschrich
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?