Jade Partners, LLC v. Alternative Crops, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jade Partners, LLC
Defendant: Calico Hemp, Inc. and Alternative Crops, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00458
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to Fayette Circuit Court and STRICKEN from docket. Defendant CaliCo Hemp, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #7 remains pending before state court and is not affected by this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/19/2020.(GLD)cc: COR,Fayette Circuit Court
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 11/19/2020, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: COR for dfts presented additional arguments re their failure to properly plead facts supporting diversity jurisdiction. A separate Memorandum Opinion and Order shall be filed forthwith outlining the court's ruling. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. (Court Reporter Elaine Haberer.) (SLH)cc: COR
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Calico Hemp, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zoppoth, Scott)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Scott Zoppoth re #7 MOTION to Dismiss: ERROR 1: the incorrect event Memorandum In Support was selected. Entry by Attorney;Clerk re-defined the document as a Motion to Dismiss. No furtheraction required by counsel as to Error 1. ERROR 2: Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (GLD)
November 16, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (GLD)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alternative Crops, LLC, Calico Hemp, Inc.. (Zoppoth, Scott)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Calico Hemp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Seed and Technology and Sale Agreement)(Zoppoth, Scott) Modified on 11/16/2020 (GLD). Modified event type on 11/16/2020 (GLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (GLD).
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jade Partners, LLC by Alternative Crops, LLC.(Zoppoth, Scott)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Scott P. Zoppoth. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Alternative Crops, LLC and Calico Hemp, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
November 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (JLM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1 filed by Alternative Crops, LLC, Calico Hemp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice and Certificate of Removal)(Zoppoth, Scott)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal. This matter shall come on for a hearing on Thursday, 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. The defendants should be prepared to address why this matter should not be remanded to state court for failure to properly plead subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/12/20.(JLM)cc: COR,D
November 12, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-2415. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4824716), filed by Alternative Crops, LLC, Calico Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jade Partners, LLC v. Alternative Crops, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calico Hemp, Inc.
Represented By: Liz Darling Edmondson
Represented By: Scott P. Zoppoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Crops, LLC
Represented By: Liz Darling Edmondson
Represented By: Scott P. Zoppoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Partners, LLC
Represented By: Nolan Miller Jackson
Represented By: M. Tyler Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?