Fifth Third Bank, N.A., v. Advanced Component Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,
Defendant: Louis A. Police, Kara D. Police and Advanced Component Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00500
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: re #30 JOINT Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. (1) Each party shall bear its own costs and fees; (2) All claims against the Defendants in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (3) All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT; and (4) The Clerk shall STRIKE THIS MATTER FROM THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/09/21.(JLM)cc: COR
July 9, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #30 Stipulation of Dismissal (JLM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,. (Imhof, Kevin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: 1. Any proceedings and deadlines are CONTINUED GENERALLY. 2. Any pending requests for relief in this action are DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Parties shall FILE either agreed of dismissal or joint status report no later than by 6/18/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/17/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
May 13, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.)
May 13, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #28 Status Report (JLM)
May 11, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #26 Proposed Agreed Order for Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: (1) The parties SHALL FILE a joint status report no later than Thursday, May 13, 2021, advising the Court of the status of the parties' settlement negotiations and providing a more thorough explanation of the need for additional extensions of time to file an answer to the complaint; and(2) The Court will consider the parties' Eighth Proposed Agreed Order [DE #26 ] after reviewing the parties status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/03/21.(JLM)cc: COR
May 3, 2021 ***PROPOSED AGREED ORDER SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #26 Proposed Agreed Order for Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (JLM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 26 Proposed Agreed Order for Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SEVENTH AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Defendants shall have up to and including 4/30/2021 to answer or respond to complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/22/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
April 22, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #24 Proposed Agreed Order for Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 Seventh Proposed Agreed Order for Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.) Modified on 4/22/2021 (GLD).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SIXTH AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Defendants shall have up to 4/21/2021 to answer or respond to Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/8/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
April 8, 2021 Filing 22 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FIFTH AGREED ORDER: re #20 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants shall have to and through April 7, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [DE #1 ]. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/22/21. (JLM)cc: COR
March 22, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #20 Fifth Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 FIFTH Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fifth Third Bank, N.A. Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.) Modified on 3/22/2021 (GLD).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FOURTH AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: re #18 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants shall have to and through March 18, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [DE #1 ]. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/9/21. (JLM)cc: COR
March 9, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #18 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 18 Fourth Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fifth Third Bank, N.A., Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.) Modified on 3/9/2021 (GLD).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 THIRD AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: IT IS ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including 3/8/2021 to answer or respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/1/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
February 26, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #16 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: re #14 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants shall have to and through February 25, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [DE #1 ]. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/17/21. (JLM)cc: COR
February 16, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #14 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
February 15, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Fifth Third Bank, N.A., Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.) Modified on 2/16/2021 (GLD).
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Component Group, LLC. (Harned, J.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER re #8 Proposed Agreed Order: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall have to and through 2/15/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/4/2021.(KM)cc: COR
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, J. Wesley Harned. #8 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police has been filed by Advanced Component Group, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD)
February 4, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #8 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police (GLD)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case by random draw to another Judge accepting cases on the Lexington docket pursuant to the General Order governing case assignment. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 2/3/21.(JLM)cc: COR
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fifth Third Bank, N.A. Advanced Component Group, LLC, Kara D. Police, Louis A. Police. (Harned, J.) Modified to add all filers on 2/4/2021 (GLD).
February 3, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A., via Personal / Registered Agent to All Defendants. (Imhof, Kevin)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Kara D. Police, #2 Summons as to Louis A. Police)(GLD)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fifth Third Bank, N.A., re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Advanced Component Group, LLC, #2 Summons Summons Louis A. Police, #3 Summons Summons Kara D. Police)(Imhof, Kevin)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fifth Third Bank, N.A., identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,.. (Imhof, Kevin)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kevin Imhof. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4850690), filed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit First Guaranty, #4 Exhibit Second Guaranty, #5 Exhibit 4 Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 Acceleration and Demand Letter)(GLD)
December 14, 2020 Conflict Check run. (GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank, N.A., v. Advanced Component Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis A. Police
Represented By: John Melvin Camenisch, Jr.
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara D. Police
Represented By: John Melvin Camenisch, Jr.
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Component Group, LLC
Represented By: John Melvin Camenisch, Jr.
Represented By: J. Wesley Harned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.,
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Imhof
Represented By: Mark T. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?