Spendthrift Stallions, LLC et al v. The Jockey Club et al
Plaintiff: Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC and Bemak N.V. doing business as Ashford Stud
Defendant: Marc Guilfoil, The Jockey Club and Jonathan Rabinowitz
Case Number: 5:2021cv00051
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Proposed Agreed Order: This matter came before the Court on the agreement of the parties to extend, by 5 pages, the page limit for the Response and the Reply to the Motion to Dismiss filed by The Jockey Club, and the Court, having determined that the Motion is well taken, given the breadth of the issues raised in the Motion, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a Response of up to 30 pages and The Jockey Club may file a Reply of up to 20 pages. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/22/21. (JLM)cc: COR, and Fitts, Hassi by US mail
April 22, 2021 Filing 25 Proposed Agreed Order Agreed Order Extending Page Limits by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC. (Hunter, Barry)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward D. Hassi. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/30/21. (JLM)cc: COR and Edward D. Hassi(w/ecf form) by US Mail
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nelson O. Fitts. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/30/21. (JLM)cc: COR and Nelson O. Fitts(w/ecf form) by US Mail
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leah S. Martin. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/30/21. (JLM)cc: COR and Leah S. Martin(w/ecf form) by US Mail
March 30, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #19 MOTION for Edward D. Hassi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932705), #20 MOTION for Leah S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932732), #18 MOTION for Nelson O. Fitts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932691) (JLM)
March 30, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed re #19 MOTION for Edward D. Hassi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932705), #18 MOTION for Nelson O. Fitts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932691), #20 MOTION for Leah S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932732). (JLM)
March 30, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Leah S. Martin,Edward D. Hassi,Nelson O. Fitts for The Jockey Club added. (JLM)
March 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by The Jockey Club (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - KRS 230.210(5), #3 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leah S. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932732) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Edward D. Hassi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932705) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Nelson O. Fitts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Jockey Club ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4932691) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marc Guilfoil, Jonathan Rabinowitz.(Thompson, Thomas)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER: 1) Dfts shall answer or move to dismiss Plas' #1 Complaint on or before 03/29/2021; 2) If necessary, Plas shall file a response to Dfts' motion on or before 04/28/2021; and 3) is necessary, Dfts shall file a reply in support of their motion on or before 05/19/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 03/18/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
March 17, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Steven Brian Loy,W. Chapman Hopkins,Adam Clay Reeves for The Jockey Club added. (JLM)
March 17, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Jennifer M. Wolsing,Thomas C. Thompson for Marc Guilfoil,Jennifer M. Wolsing,Thomas C. Thompson for Jonathan Rabinowitz added. (JLM)
March 17, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #14 Proposed Agreed Order by The Jockey Club (JLM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Jockey Club. (Loy, Steven)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order by The Jockey Club. (Hopkins, W.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC, Bemak N.V. via personal service by Constable to Jonathan Rabinowitz served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Hunter, Barry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC, Bemak N.V. via personal service by Constable to Marc Guilfoil served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Hunter, Barry)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew C. Blickensderfer. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/26/21. (JLM)cc: COR
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC, Bemak N.V. via hand-delivery to registered agent by Constable to The Jockey Club served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Hunter, Barry) Modified date of service/answer due on 3/1/2021 (JLM).
February 26, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #8 MOTION for Matthew C. Blickensderfer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4905801) (JLM)
February 26, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Matthew C. Blickensderfer re #8 MOTION for Matthew C. Blickensderfer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4905801). (JLM)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC re #8 MOTION for Matthew C. Blickensderfer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4905801) Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunter, Barry)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Matthew C. Blickensderfer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bemak N.V., Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4905801) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Blickensderfer, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hunter, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (JLM).
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Three Chimneys Farm, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Three Chimneys Holdings, LLC for Three Chimneys Farm, LLC.. (Hunter, Barry)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 4G Thoroughbreds, LLC for Spendthrift Stallions, LLC.. (Hunter, Barry)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bemak N.V.. (Hunter, Barry)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Barry D. Hunter, Medrith Lee Norman, and W. Craig Robertson III. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC; Bemak, N.V.; and Three Chimneys Farm, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marc Guilfoil, Jonathan Rabinowitz, The Jockey Club; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -Jonathan Rabinowitz, #2 Summons -Marc Guilfoil)(JER)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4902759), filed by Spendthrift Stallions, LLC, Three Chimneys Farm, LLC, Bemak N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -The Jockey Club, #3 Summons -Jonathan Rabinowitz, #4 Summons Marc Guilfoil)(JER)
February 23, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spendthrift Stallions, LLC et al v. The Jockey Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Guilfoil
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wolsing
Represented By: Thomas C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jockey Club
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Edward D. Hassi
Represented By: Adam Clay Reeves
Represented By: Nelson O. Fitts
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Rabinowitz
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wolsing
Represented By: Thomas C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spendthrift Stallions, LLC
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Represented By: W. Craig Robertson, III
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Chimneys Farm, LLC
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bemak N.V. doing business as Ashford Stud
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?