Parshall v. Kentucky Bancshares, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Parshall
Defendant: Shannon B. Arvin, Kentucky Bancshares, Inc., Woodford Van Meter, Ted McClain, Edwin S. Saunier, Louis Prichard, Robert G. Thompson, Mary McDowell Hoskins, Jack W. Omohundro, Henry Hinkle, Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc., B. Proctor Caudill, Jr. and H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00108
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Court DIRECTS Clerk to STRIKE this matter from Court's docket as dismissed without prejudice, per the notice. Court DENIES #26 Motion to Dismiss as moot. In event that Plaintiff files an action in this District based on same claim against same defendant(s), that Clerk assign case to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 5/26/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
May 26, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: #28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (GLD)
May 25, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Parshall (Skees, William)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: DENIED AS WITHDRAWN pla's 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION for Hearing; the court CANCELS the 5/4/21 hearing & will react dubiously to further requests by pla for hastened process. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 5/3/21.(KJR)cc: COR,London Diary
May 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Shannon B. Arvin, B. Proctor Caudill, Jr, H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc., Henry Hinkle, Mary McDowell Hoskins, Kentucky Bancshares, Inc., Ted McClain, Jack W. Omohundro, Louis Prichard, Edwin S. Saunier, Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc., Robert G. Thompson, Woodford Van Meter (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Skolnick, Cory)
May 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Paul Parshall re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (Skees, William) Modified on 5/3/2021 (JLM).
May 3, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall filed by Shannon B. Arvin, B. Proctor Caudill, Jr, H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc., Henry Hinkle, Mary McDowell Hoskins, Kentucky Bancshares, Inc., Ted McClain, Jack W. Omohundro, Louis Prichard, Edwin S. Saunier, Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc., Robert G. Thompson, Woodford Van Meter. (Loy, Steven)
May 3, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Shannon B. Arvin,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for B. Proctor Caudill, Jr,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Henry Hinkle,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Mary McDowell Hoskins,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Kentucky Bancshares, Inc.,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Ted McClain,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Jack W. Omohundro,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Louis Prichard,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Edwin S. Saunier,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Robert G. Thompson,W. Chapman Hopkins,Monica Hobson Braun,Felisa Sue Moore for Woodford Van Meter added. (JLM)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The undersigned magistrate judge RECUSES himself from service in the above-styled action. This matter shall be reassigned to another magistrate judge (Atkins) is accordance with the Court's general orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 4/30/2021.(KM)cc: COR
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Bancshares, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon B. Arvin, B. Proctor Caudill, Jr, Henry Hinkle, Mary McDowell Hoskins, Kentucky Bancshares, Inc., Ted McClain, Jack W. Omohundro, Louis Prichard, Edwin S. Saunier, Robert G. Thompson, Woodford Van Meter. (Loy, Steven)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (KM)cc: COR
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants SHALL respond to DE 7 by 5/3/2021 at 2:00 p.m. The responsive briefs should economy & focus on the key issues, documents, and standards; and 2. The Court SETS a MOTION HEARING for 5/4/2021 at 01:00 PM in LONDON before Judge Robert E. Wier. The hearing will be in person. Exigencies of docket & activities at District Courthouses required the London hearing; 3. The parties should be aware that the District has recommenced criminal which sharply limits the Courts scheduling flexibility in this case. As a result, the Court will modify this schedule only for extraordinary cause.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/30/2021.(KM)cc: COR, London Clerk Modified on 5/3/2021 (STC).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph M. Hood recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert E. Wier for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/29/21.(KJR)cc: COR
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The undersigned RECUSES from further participation in the above-styled action. It is ORDERED this action is REASSIGNED by random draw to another Judge assigned to accept civil cases in Lexington. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph M. Hood for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/29/2021.(KM)cc: COR
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Caldwell for all further proceedings. Judge Danny C. Reeves no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/29/21.(KJR)cc: COR
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom recuses from this matter. Court DIRECTS Clerk to reassign by random draw to another Judge on the Lexington docket (Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves) for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/29/2021.(GLD)cc: COR
April 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (KJR)
April 29, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KM)
April 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (GLD)
April 29, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
April 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (KJR)
April 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (KJR)
April 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Parshall MOTION for Discovery by Paul Parshall MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, by Paul Parshall (KM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Injunction Pending Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Hearing for a Post-Expedited Discovery Motion to Continue the Temporary Injunction Pending Trial by Paul Parshall. (filed with the State Court Record & located as an attachment to the #1 Notice of Removal). (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc., Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc. (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SYBT for Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc. (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc., Corporate Parent SYBT for H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc. (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory J. Skolnick on behalf of H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc., Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc. (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Consent to Removal by Shannon B. Arvin, B. Proctor Caudill, Jr, Henry Hinkle, Mary McDowell Hoskins, Kentucky Bancshares, Inc., Ted McClain, Jack W. Omohundro, Louis Prichard, Edwin S. Saunier, Robert G. Thompson, Woodford Van Meter (KJR)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bourbon Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-109. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4959731), filed by Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc., H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJR)
April 28, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parshall v. Kentucky Bancshares, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon B. Arvin
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodford Van Meter
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted McClain
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin S. Saunier
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Prichard
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Thompson
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McDowell Hoskins
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack W. Omohundro
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Hinkle
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stock Yards Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Proctor Caudill, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: W. Chapman Hopkins
Represented By: Felisa Sue Moore
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Meyer Merger Subsidiary, Inc.
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Parshall
Represented By: William Edward Skees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?