Snowden v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Crystal Snowden
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00144
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: 1. Counsel must confer and receive permission before filing motions to compel or motions related to discovery dispute; 2.Parties SHALL assess any potential resolution. Parties may mediate through private mediator or request a settlement conference w/ MJ; 3. Dft shall file administrative record under seal, and provide Pltf unredacted copy, NLT 8/25/2021; 4. Discovery due by 1/25/2022; 5. Discovery subject to limitations listed w/in Order; 6.Parties agree that abuse of discretion is the applicable standard for review; 7.Pltf's motion to amend/join additional parties due NLT 10/26/2021; 8. Dft motion to amend pleadings/ join additional parties due NLT 11/29/2021; 9. Parties' motions for judgment on the Admin. Record shall be filed on or before 4/21/22; 10. Response brief shall be filed on or before 4/21/22; 11. All reply briefs shall be filed on or before 5/19/2022; 12. Motion practice shall be governed by Rule 7.1; 13. Failure to respond to a motion shall be grounds for the Court to conclude that any arguments in opposition have been waived. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/27/2021.(SLH)cc: COR
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Thrash, Braxton) Modified Filers on 7/26/2021 (MDC).
July 26, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MDC)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1) Parties meet within 21 days; 2) Joint Meeting Report due within 10 days thereafter; 3) Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 06/24/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wahlheim, William)
June 23, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #10 Answer to Complaint (MDC)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) Dft's #7 and #8 Motions for Admission PHV of Braxton S. Thrash and William B. Wahlheim, Jr are GRANTED;2) Braxton S. Thrash and William B. Wahlheim, Jr. are ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 06/16/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
June 16, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #7 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, #8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MDC)
June 16, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Braxton S. Thrash & William B. Wahlheim, Jr re #7 / #8 MOTIONS for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MDC)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4996143) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William B. Wahlheim, Jr., #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4995463) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Thrash, Braxton)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Court GRANTS Parties' #5 Proposed Agreed Order. Dft's responsive pleadings deadline is 06/23/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 05/28/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
May 28, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (MDC)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William) Modified Filers on 5/28/2021 (MDC).
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William B. Wahlheim, Jr.. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number 21-ci-199. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4979955), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
May 26, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Snowden
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?