Liggins v. Biomet Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ulysses Liggins and Ullysses Liggins
Defendant: Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00167
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) W/in 14 days from this date, parties exchange information by Rule 26(a)(1). 2) NLT 01/17/2022, Pla shall disclose identity of expert witnesses; NLT 02/16/2022, Dfts shall disclose the identity of expert witnesses. 3) Supplementation under Rule 26(e) shall be due within 30 days of the discovery of new information, but no later than 30 days prior to the close of discovery. 4) Discovery due by 4/1/2022. 5) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all discovery disputes are referred to the USMJ Matthew A. Stinnett. 6) All motions for extensions of time shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. 7) The parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order. 8) Motions to Amend Pleadings and/or Join Additional parties due by 9/30/2021. 9) Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2022. 10) Pretrial Filings due by 10/3/2022. 11) On or before 10/03/2022, counsel shall pre-mark and number all exhibits. 12) On or before 10/03/2022, counsel shall file with the Clerk and shall submit to the Court, Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions with supporting authorities. 13) On or before 10/11/2022, counsel shall file with the Clerk, submit to the Court, and provide to opposing counsel, any objections to the use of depositions or to the admissibility of exhibits pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(B). 14) The pretrial filings may be submitted to the undersigned at reeves_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. 15) NLT 10/11/2022, the parties shall submit to the Court's chambers a copy of each exhibit. 16) JURY TRIAL set for 10/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Counsel to be present at 08:30 a.m. (10 days). 17) The parties may request a PT Conference if desired. 18) The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month. Separate or individual status reports are not permitted. 19) The parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 07/29/2021. (MDC) cc: COR, D, JC
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schaefer, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Dfts' #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of Erica K. Drew is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 07/20/2021. (MDC) cc: COR; Erica K. Drew (Order + Electronic Registration Form)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5021918) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Paige)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES of Plaintiff by Ullysses Liggins.(Smallwood, Erin)
July 20, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Erica K. Drew re #11 MOTION for Erica K. Drew to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (MDC)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that the #4 Order to show cause is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 07/07/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER filed by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Heather Kidwell)(Johnson, Paige)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: Rule 26(f) meeting w/in 30 days; 2. Disclosures due at time of meeting; 3. Joint report addressing items listed w/in order due NLT 10 days after meeting. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO85-Consent to MJ)(SLH)cc: COR
June 23, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #6 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint (MDC)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC.(Schaefer, David)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc..(Schaefer, David)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Dfts shall SHOW CAUSE on or before 7/7/2021 why this matter should not be remanded to State Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 06/16/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
June 16, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Fayette County, Kentucky, case number 21-ci-1424. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4996134), filed by Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet Inc, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C-SoS Filing, #5 Exhibit D-SoS Filing, #6 Exhibit E-SoS Filing, #7 Exhibit F-SoS Filing, #8 Exhibit G-SoS Filing, #9 Exhibit H-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit I-State Court File)(JER)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ZB Manufacturing, LLC, Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc., for Biomet Manufacturing, LLC; Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc., for Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC.. (Johnson, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. Biomet Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: David T. Schaefer
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Represented By: Erica K. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: David T. Schaefer
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Represented By: Erica K. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: David T. Schaefer
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Represented By: Erica K. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schaefer
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Represented By: Erica K. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: David T. Schaefer
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Represented By: Erica K. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Liggins
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ullysses Liggins
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?