May v. Akers et al
Plaintiff: James R. May
Defendant: Joyce Puckett, Brian Kendrick, Crystal Justice, Daniel Akers, Troy Wilson, Logan Williams, Ralph Clifton, James Briggs, James Brigges and L.T. Troy Wilson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00182
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Daniel Akers served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Daniel Akers served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to James Brigges served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; James Briggs served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Troy Wilson served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Troy Wilson served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Ralph Clifton served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Ralph Clifton served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Logan Williams served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Logan Williams served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Brian Kendrick served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Brian Kendrick served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James R. May via USMS to Joyce Puckett served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James R. May as to Crystal Justice, Crystal Justice. (JER)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Daniel Akers, Daniel Akers, James Brigges, James Briggs, Ralph Clifton, Ralph Clifton, Crystal Justice, Crystal Justice, Brian Kendrick, Brian Kendrick, Joyce Puckett, Joyce Puckett, Logan Williams, Logan Williams, Troy Wilson, Troy Wilson,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (KM)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare a Service Packets for defendants Warden Daniel Akers, Deputy Warden James Briggs, UA Supervisor Troy Wilson, UA Supervisor Ralph Clifton, Sergeant Logan Williams, Program Supervisor Brian Kendrick, Officer Crystal Justice, and Nurse Practitioner Joyce Puckett. Each Service packet shall include: a completed summons form, b. the complaint, c. this order, and d. a completed USM Form 285; 2. The Deputy Clerk shall deliver service packets to USMS in Lexington & note the delivery date in the docket; 3. The USMS shall make arrangements with the appropriate officials at Lee Adjustment Center to personally served each of the Defendants with a service packet at Lee Adjustment Center, 168 Lee Adjustment Center Drive, Beattyville, KY 41311. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/17/2021.(KM)cc: COR and James R. May by US Mail
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. May's #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2. $50 administrative fee is waived. $350 filing fee to be paid; 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in May's name for receipt of the filing fees. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form & shall send the Notice & copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in which May is confined; 4. Within 28 days, May's custodian shall deduct $51.84 from May's inmate account & remit that sum to the Clerk as an initial partial filing fee; 5. For each month thereafter, if the amount in May's account exceeds $10, his custodian shall deduct from May's account an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month & remit that sum to the Clerk. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Form EDKY 525) (KM)cc: COR, Finance, and James R. May & Warden, Southeast Correctional Complex with Form EDKY 525 by US Mail
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James R. May. (JER)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James R. May Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope bearing 8/11/2021 postmark)(JER)
August 16, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James R. May (JER)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Clerk is directed to unseal #6 EX PARTE Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 2. May's #6 EX PARTE Petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. 3. Clerk directed to mark assigned case number on AO 240 form and EDKY 523 form and send them to May. 4. Within 21 days, May must either pay $402 filing fee or complete and file these forms. If fails to do so, Court will dismiss case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO 240, #2 EDKY 523)(GLD)cc: COR and May by US Mail w/forms
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 EX PARTE Petition for Writ of Mandamus by James R. May Motions referred to PSO. Submitted originals of Attachment 1 are illegibly pale copies of documents. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope bearing 7/23/2021 postmark)(JER) Modified to UNSEAL PER ORDER #7 on 7/29/2021 (GLD).
July 29, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #6 EX PARTE MOTION by James R. May (JER)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark the assigned case number on an affidavit of assets/in forma pauperis application [Form AO-240] and a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523] and send them to May. 3. Within twenty-eight days, May must either pay the $400.00 in filing and administrative fees or complete and file each of the forms referenced in paragraph 2 above. If he fails to do so, the Court will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/06/21. (JLM)cc: COR and James R. May by US Mail
June 30, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by James R. May (KJR)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 sample caption)(KJR)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James R. May (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (KJR) Modified on 7/6/2021 (JLM).
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to P SO., filed by James R. May (pro se). (Attachments: #1 grievance forms (1 doc was illegible & words cut off at the bottom of the page), #2 Summons, #3 env postmarked 6/24/21)(KJR)
June 29, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Akers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brigges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?