Stinson v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Stinson
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company and Robin Sklar
Case Number: 5:2021cv00206
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 1/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett (in person). In preparation for and in order to facilitate the scheduled settlement conference, counsel for each party is to submit only to Stinnett_Chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. on January 19, 2022, a confidential settlement statement, no longer than five (5) pages, that includes the following: 1. A brief statement of the facts giving rise to this action; 2. A description of the strongest and weakest points in your case and in your opponent's case, both legal and factual; 3. Any major obstacle to settlement; 4. The name of each person participating in or attending the settlement conference on your behalf and certifying they have settlement authority; and 5. Any attached document(s) the parties believe is necessary for the Court to review prior to the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 9/10/21.(JLM)cc: COR,D
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. Defendant shall see medical examination & a vocational assessment of the Plaintiff on or before 12/31/2021; 2. The parties may conduct discovery & retain expert witnesses on the factual issues on or before 11/1/2021; 3. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Stinnett for a settlement conference; 4. The parties shall file a status report or or before 1/30/2022. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/2/2021.(KM)cc: COR
August 31, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JER)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FOR ROBIN SKLAR: IT IS HEREBY AGREED AND ORDERED the claims of Ptf. Stinson against Dft. Robin Sklar are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. This is a final and appealable order, and no just cause for delay in its entry. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/30/2021.(JER)cc: COR
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robin Sklar (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order of Voluntary Dismissal)(Cassis, Charles)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cassis, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within 21 days of this order parties shall meet to discuss this case and possibilities of prompt resolution or arrange disclosures. 2) 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report. Counsel may utilize form 52 Fed. R. Civ. P. as the form of status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/29/2021.(JER)cc: COR
July 29, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint (JER)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Protective Insurance Company.(Cassis, Charles)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Robin Sklar.(Cassis, Charles)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Robert Stinson of Compliance with KRS 411.188 (Morrin, Robert)
July 28, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Charles H. Cassis re #2 FRCP 7.1 Disclosure; Error: Attorney filed duplicate entries; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk modified the text of #2 to indicate it was incorrectly filed. cc: COR (JER)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison Circuit Court, case number 21-ci-302. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5028068), filed by Protective Insurance Company, Robin Sklar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Summons Corp. Service Company, #5 Exhibit D-Summons Robin Sklar)(JER)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 DUPLICATE FILING of DE #1 . (Cassis, Charles) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (JER).
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Protective Insurance Company. (Cassis, Charles)
July 27, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stinson
Represented By: Robert A. Morrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Christina R.L. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Sklar
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Christina R.L. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?