Fellows v. Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Fellows
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. and Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00220
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
2 Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. All claims remaining in this matter are DISMISSED, with prejudice; 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the docket; 3. The parties shall bear their respective costs, fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/19/2022.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
October 19, 2022 Filing 21 Proposed Agreed Order /Stipulation of Dismissal by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (Simpson, W.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 20 Joint NOTICE of Settlement by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc, Sandra Lee Fellows. (Simpson, W.) Modified to add filers on 10/19/2022 (KM).
October 19, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #20 Joint Notice of Settlement, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #21 Proposed Agreed Order /Stipulation of Dismissal by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. (KM)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Paragraph 12 of the Scheduling Order #7 is AMENDED to provide as follows: The parties SHALL immediately assess any potential for agreed resolution of the case and should continue to make that assessment as litigation continues. The parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute; 2. The Scheduling Order #7 is SUPPLEMENTED with the following: The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month. Failure to timely comply with this requirement will result in the matter being set for a status conference, requiring the attendance of counsel and the parties; 3. The original Scheduling Order #7 remains in effect in all other respects. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/18/2022.(SAM)cc: COR
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Danny C. Reeves for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph M. Hood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/14/2022.(STC)cc: COR
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: DENYING parties' #15 JOINT MOTION for Hearing; (1) mediation to take place by 8/15/22; (2) if mediation is unsuccessful, dfts are to disclose expert witnesses by 9/15/22, w/disc to close by 10/31/22; (3) Dispositive Motions due by 1/2/2023; (4) Daubert motions is 90 days before trial; (5) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (6) JURY TRIAL set for 5/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (5-6 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/11/22.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D
July 11, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #15 JOINT MOTION for Hearing by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. (KJR)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Hearing by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Simpson, W.)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The #13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED as follows: 1. Fact discovery shall end on 2/28/2022; 2. Plaintiff shall disclosed experts on or before 3/31/2022, with depositions to be completed within 45 days after disclosure. Defendant shall disclose experts on or before 5/15/2022, with deposition to be completed within 45 days after disclosure; 3. All other deadlines in the previous scheduling order #7 shall remain in force & are unaffected in this order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/7/2022.(KM)cc: COR
January 7, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. (JER)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER: re #11 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Agreement to Maintain Confidentiality) (JLM)cc: COR
October 25, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #11 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. (JER)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Simpson, W.)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Hanly Ingram. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 9/29/2021.(KM)cc: COR
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures is due by 10/15/21 for pla - dft by 10/29/21; (2) Discovery due by 4/15/2021; (3) max of 30 interrogatories by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (4) max of 30 requests for admission by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (5) no limit to the number of depos; (6) pla disclose experts & provide info required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 by 1/15/22 w/depos to be completed w/in 6 weeks after discl; dft by 3/1/22; (7) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 1/28/2022; (8) parties supplement all discl & responses as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(E); (9) Dispositive Motions & motions to exclude expert testimony due by 5/1/2022; (10) Motions in limine made pursuant to Daubert is due 90 days before trial; (11) discovery disputes REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; (12) court encourages early & economic case resolution including mediation; (13) motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition; (14) parties shall conduct discovery pursuant to Federal & Joint Local Rules; (15) the scope of disc & parties' obligations in disc are governed by Fed Rules; (15) motion practice shall be governed by Local Rules except as provided in this order; (16) pretrial filings are due 10 days before final PTC; (17) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (18) JURY TRIAL set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (5-6 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/24/21.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D
September 23, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (GLD)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simpson, W.)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a) (1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order; 3) advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/9/21.(JLM)cc: COR
September 9, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.,Joseph A. Wright for Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. added. (JLM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc... (Simpson, W.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc..(Simpson, W.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5049072) filed by Sandra Lee Fellows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)
August 23, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fellows v. Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Fellows
Represented By: Escum L. Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?