Affiliated FM Insurance Company v. Ram Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Defendant: Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc. doing business as Walker Consultants and RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00233
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: GRANTING #21 Motion for Order for Jeffrey M. Sangster to appear pro hac vice for RAM Construction Services of Michigan, In. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/2/21. (KJR)cc: CORand Jeffrey M. Sangster by US Mail
November 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Order by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. Renewed Motion to Admit Jeffrey M. Sangster Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Affidavit of Jeffrey M. Sangster, #2 Proposed Order)(Estill, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Tyler P. Phillips, Jeffrey M. Sangster re #19 MOTION for Tyler P. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5111582), #18 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Sangster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5111544). (KM)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: denying #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Sangster; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tyler P. Phillips. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/28/2021. (JER)cc: COR
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Tyler P. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5111582) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Tyler P. Phillips, #2 Proposed Order)(Estill, Patrick)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Sangster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5111544) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Affidavit of Jeffrey M. Sangster, #2 Proposed Order)(Estill, Patrick)
October 28, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Tyler P. Phillips: re #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Tyler P. Phillips (JER)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ram Construction Services of Michigan, Inc., Other Affiliate RAM Construction Services of Cleveland, LLC, Other Affiliate RAM Construction Services of Minnesota, LLC, Other Affiliate RAM Construction Services of Cincinnati, LLC for RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc... (Estill, Patrick)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is ORDERD that the parties' motion #14 is GRANTED. Defendant RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. shall have until 11/15/2021 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/18/2021.(KM)cc: COR
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Patrick Estill. #13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
October 18, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #14 Stipulation (KM)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, on Extending Time to File an Answer to the Complaint by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc.. (Estill, Patrick)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc.. (Estill, Patrick)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company via Certified Mail on Registered Agent to Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Orr, Jefferson)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company via Certified Mail on Registered Agent to RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Orr, Jefferson)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc.. (Duzyk, Darren)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc..(Duzyk, Darren)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Orr, Jefferson)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jefferson C. Orr, S. Joseph Wellborn, and Vic L. McConnell. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #5 MOTION for S. Joseph Welborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082993), #4 MOTION for Jefferson C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082981). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/23/2021. (KM)cc: COR
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for S. Joseph Welborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082993) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from TN Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC Middle TN, #3 Proposed Order granting Motion to Practice Pro Hac Vice of S. Joseph Welborn)(McConnell, Vic)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Jefferson C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082981) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from TN Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - USDC Middle TN, #3 Proposed Order granting Motion to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Jefferson C. Orr)(McConnell, Vic)
September 23, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jefferson C. Orr, S. Joseph Welborn re #5 MOTION for S. Joseph Welborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082993), #4 MOTION for Jefferson C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5082981). (KM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc., Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -Walker)(JER)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5074361), filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Walker Condition Assessment Report, #2 Exhibit 2-Walker Letter to Dawn Davis, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons -RAM, #5 Summons Walker)(JER)
September 15, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affiliated FM Insurance Company v. Ram Construction Services of Michigan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Vic L. McConnell
Represented By: Jefferson C. Orr
Represented By: S. Joseph Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Parking Consultants/Engineers, Inc. doing business as Walker Consultants
Represented By: Darren J. Duzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Construction Services of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sangster
Represented By: Patrick F. Estill
Represented By: Tyler P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?