Thorpe v. Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Thorpe
Defendant: Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky, Superintendent Anthony Orr and Principal Brian Wilson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00241
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1a. initial disclosures exchanged NLT 12/01/21; b. fact discovery due NLT 9/01/2022; expert discovery due NLT 9/01/2022; Supplementation due w/in 30 days of new info, but no later than 45 days prior to close of discovery; d. Motion to Join/Amend due by 3/1/2022 from pltf and 4/1/2022 from dfts; disclose expert witnesses from pltf NLT 6/1/2022 and dfts NLT 8/01/2022; dispositive motions due NLT 10/01/2022; 2. initial disclosures, interrogatories and answers thereto, requests for production of documents and answers thereto, documents and discovery depos shall not be filed; portions of discovery depos cited in any motion or any other discovery materials necessary to decision of any motion shall be filed of record; 3. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. 4. Pretrial Filings due 21 days before PTC; 5. 14 days before PTC, parties file written objections to witnesses and exhibits; responses to motions in limine, responses to motions for ruling on objections made in evidentiary depos; 6. At PTC, parties prepared to discuss stipulations of admissibility, disclosures demonstrative or summary exhibits, display to Court all trial exhibits, discuss possibility of settlement, advise Court of anticipated technological issues; 7. 7 days prior to trial, submit copy of exhibits to Chambers; 8. JURY TRIAL set for 3/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Claria Horn Boom; counsel present at 8:30 a.m. (5 days). 9. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Stinnett for resolving non-dispositive pretrial motions, generally managing discovery, generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, conducting mid-discovery telephone conference, conducting settlement conference; 10. Discovery disputes resolution; 11. Modification of this schedule unlikely and will only occur for good cause. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/17/21.(JLM)cc: COR,JC,D
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Turpin, Zachary)
November 16, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Boom for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky, Anthony Orr, Brian Wilson Notice of Service of Discovery (Turpin, Zachary)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) parties meet w/in 21 days; exchange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due w/in 14 days thereafter; (3) Rule 7.1 disclosures statements due at the time of parties' joint status report. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/22/21.(KJR)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2021: #1 MJ Consent Form) (KJR).
October 22, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Zachary Lyndon Turpin: re #4 Answer to Complaint. An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Zachary Lyndon Turpin (JLM)
October 22, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Elizabeth Bass,Zachary Lyndon Turpin for Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky,Elizabeth Bass,Zachary Lyndon Turpin for Anthony Orr,Elizabeth Bass,Zachary Lyndon Turpin for Brian Wilson added. (JLM)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky, Anthony Orr, Brian Wilson.(Richardson, Melissa)
October 1, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -Orr, #2 Summons -Wilson)(JER)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5088877), filed by Rebecca Thorpe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-3/17/21 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2-5/3/21 Letter, #4 Summons -Board of Education, #5 Summons -Orr, #6 Summons -Wilson)(JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorpe v. Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Thorpe
Represented By: Edward E. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Powell County, Kentucky
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Zachary Lyndon Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Anthony Orr
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Zachary Lyndon Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Brian Wilson
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Elizabeth Bass
Represented By: Zachary Lyndon Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?