Rosado-Cruz v. King-Kelly, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Priscilla Rosado-Cruz
Defendant: King-Kelly, Inc. doing business as Cowboy's Showgirls, Warren Lee King, Kevin King and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 5:2021cv00276
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of the defendants; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/17/2021.(KM)cc: COR
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. The defendants' #6 motion to compel arbitration and dismiss is GRANTED; 2. This matter is COMPELLED to arbitration; 3. This action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and STRICKEN from the docket; 4. A separate Judgment shall issue this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/17/2021.(KM)cc: COR
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to John P. Kristensen and Jesenia A. Martinez: Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JER)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by John P. Kristensen (Kristensen, John)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Kristensen: Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/02/2021. (JER)cc: COR
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz re #8 MOTION for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5136316) (Shepherd, Liz)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certificate of Service by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz re #8 MOTION for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5136316) (Shepherd, Liz) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (KM).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz First Notice of Consent to Join- Robinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wxhibit 1 - Consent - Candice Robinson)(Shepherd, Liz)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5136316) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shepherd, Liz)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to John P. Kristensen. (JER)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Update. Attorney John P. Kristensen for Priscilla Rosado-Cruz added. (JER)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by King-Kelly, Inc.. (Cooley, Edward)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Does 1 through 10, Kevin King, Warren Lee King, King-Kelly, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Entertainer Lease Agreement, #3 Proposed Order)(Cooley, Edward)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Danny C. Reeves, Chief US District Judge, for all further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/02/2021.(JER)cc: COR
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Danny C. Reeves added. Judge Joseph M. Hood no longer assigned to case. (JER)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kevin King, Warren Lee King, King-Kelly, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -King-Kelly, #2 Summons W. King)(JER)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5112490), filed by Priscilla Rosado-Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Joint Collective Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons -K. King, #4 Summons -King-Kelly, Inc., #5 Summons W. King)(JER)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Cruz v. King-Kelly, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Rosado-Cruz
Represented By: Liz J. Shepherd
Represented By: John P. Kristensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King-Kelly, Inc. doing business as Cowboy's Showgirls
Represented By: Edward L. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lee King
Represented By: Edward L. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin King
Represented By: Edward L. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Represented By: Edward L. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?