Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Lexmark International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00097
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #23 & #24 Motions for Joseph P. Reid & Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/20/2022. (MDC) cc: COR and Amy E. Simpson & Joseph P. Reid by US Mail
May 20, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Joseph P. Reid re #23 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc.(MDC)
May 20, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Amy E. Simpson re #24 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (MDC)
May 20, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #24 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc.; #23 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (MDC)
May 20, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Joseph P. Reid & Amy E. Simpson: re 25 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349.(MDC) cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Joseph P. Reid & Amy E. Simpson
May 19, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270240) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
May 19, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270193) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: By agreement of the parties, Court GRANTS #16 Proposed Order. Answer due by 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/10/2022. (MDC) cc: COR
May 10, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Joseph P. Reid by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (MDC)
May 10, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Amy E. Simpson by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (MDC)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RECUSAL ORDER: The undersigned RECUSES form the civil actions. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reassign these related matters in accordance with General Order 21-14. (Randomly reassigned to Judge Caldwell). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/10/2022.(KM)cc: COR
May 10, 2022 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
May 10, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Lexmark International, Inc. (Loy, Steven)
May 10, 2022 Conflict Check run. (KM)
May 10, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #16 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Lexmark International, Inc. (MDC)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pltf's #14 Motion for Timothy E. Grochocinski to appear PHV is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/9/2022. (SLH)cc: CORand Grochocinski by US Mail
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for TIMOTHY E. GROCHOCINSKI to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5261579) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Illinois Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - ILND Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting Pla's #12 Motion for Charles Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 05/09/2022. (MDC) cc: COR and Charles Austin Ginnings by US Mail
May 9, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed re #14 MOTION for TIMOTHY E. GROCHOCINSKI to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5261579). (SLH)
May 9, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Charles Austin Ginnings re #12 MOTION for C. Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.(MDC)
May 9, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Charles Austin Ginnings: re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Charles Austin Ginnings (MDC)
May 9, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Timothy E. Grochocinski: re #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Timothy E. Grochocinski (SLH)
May 8, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for C. Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5261073) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New York Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - NYSD Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Lexmark International, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MDC)
April 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Francis, James)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Judge Danny C. Reeves for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/18/2022. (MDC) cc: COR
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Francis, James)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Charles Austin Ginnings by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2022: #1 Rule 83.1 and 83.2 and forms) (JER).
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Timothy E. Grochocinski by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James M. Francis, Timothy E. Grochocinski, and Charles Austin Ginnings. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (JER)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $402; receipt number BKYEDC-5242765), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US9036181, #2 Exhibit 2-US10140071, #3 Exhibit 3-US10873856, #4 Exhibit 4-Claims Chart for US9036181, #5 Exhibit 5-Claims Chart for US10140071, #6 Exhibit 6-Claims Chart for US10873856, #7 Exhibit -Columbian Article, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
April 14, 2022 Clerks Note: The Clerk notes a Complaint was filed; however, a summons was not provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Courts website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days.(JER)
April 14, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Lexmark International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Austin Ginnings
Represented By: James M. Francis
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Joseph P. Reid
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?