Carman et al v. Yellen et al
Plaintiff: Dan Carman, Coin Center, Raymond Walsh and Quiet Industries Corp.
Defendant: Janet Yellen, United States Department of Treasury, Charles Rettig, Internal Revenue Service, Merrick Garland and USA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00149
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: GRANTING dfts' #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, that dfts have until 11/7/2022 to respond to the complaint (including any amendment filed on or before 10/24/22). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/8/22.(KJR)cc: COR, J. Abraham Sutherland by US Mail. Modified text on 8/8/2022 (KJR).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Merrick Garland, Internal Revenue Service, Charles Rettig, USA, United States Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (KJR)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Merrick Garland, Internal Revenue Service, Charles Rettig, USA, United States Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Internal Revenue Service, Charles Rettig, USA, United States Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email exchange between counsel)(Bishop, Kyle)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Carman via Hand-Delivery/Certified Mail to All Defendants. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Hand-Delivery on 6/10/2022; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail on 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons IRS, #2 Summons Charles Rettig, #3 Summons Dept of Treasury, #4 Summons AG Merrick Garland, #5 Summons USA Carlton Shier IV, #6 Summons Janet Yellen)(Hargadon, Jason)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Merrick Garland, Internal Revenue Service, Charles Rettig, USA, United States Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Dan Carman, Coin Center, Quiet Industries Corp., Raymond Walsh. (Norris, Cameron)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Merrick Garland, Internal Revenue Service, Charles Rettig, USA, United States Department of Treasury, Janet Yellen or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bishop, Kyle)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Plaintiff's #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cameron T. Norris, #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Harris, #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Abraham Sutherland, and #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Hetzel ARE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/8/2022. (KM)cc: COR and Cameron T. Norris, Jeffrey M. Harris, J. Abraham Sutherland, and Jeffrey S. Hetzel by US Mail
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Hetzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hargadon, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for J. Abraham Sutherland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307083) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hargadon, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307070) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hargadon, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hargadon, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Cameron T. Norris, Jeffrey M. Harris, J. Abraham Sutherland, and Jeffrey S. Hetzel: re #17 Order. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Cameron T. Norris, Jeffrey M. Harris, J. Abraham Sutherland, and Jeffrey S. Hetzel (KM)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Cameron T. Norris, Jeffrey M. Harris, Jeffrey S. Hetzel, J. Abraham Sutherland re #16 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Hetzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307090), #14 MOTION for Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307070), #15 MOTION for J. Abraham Sutherland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307083), #13 MOTION for Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dan Carman (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5307018). (KM)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by USA. (Bishop, Kyle)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Moira Goodwin, DOJ on behalf of USA (Goodwin, Moira)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quiet Industries Corp.. (Hargadon, Jason)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coin Center. (Hargadon, Jason)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY J. Abraham Sutherland by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Cameron T. Norris by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jeffrey S. Hetzel by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER) Modified text on 6/10/2022 (JER).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jeffrey M. Harris by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel (Attachments: #1 Summons -IRS, #2 Summons -Rettig, #3 Summons -Treasury, #4 Summons -USAG, #5 Summons -USAO, #6 Summons -Yellen)(JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jason L. Hargadon, Cameron T. Norris, Jeffrey M. Harris, Jeffrey S. Hetzel, and J. Abraham Sutherland. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Coin Center and Quiet Industries Corp. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5287338), filed by Raymond Walsh, Coin Center, Dan Carman, Quiet Industries Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Garland, #3 Summons -IRS, #4 Summons -Rettig, #5 Summons -Treasury, #6 Summons -USA, #7 Summons -EDKY, #8 Summons -Yellen)(JER)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman et al v. Yellen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Carman
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jason L. Hargadon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coin Center
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jason L. Hargadon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Walsh
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jason L. Hargadon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiet Industries Corp.
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: J. Abraham Sutherland
Represented By: Jason L. Hargadon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rettig
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Represented By: Moira Goodwin, DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?