Brandenburg v. Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Executor: Jodi Brandenburg
Case Number: 5:2022cv00158
Filed: June 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The parties having agreed, as evidenced by the signatures of their counsel, below, and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this matter be, and it is, hereby DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/6/2023.(KMP)cc: COR,JC,D
June 6, 2023 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #19 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company (KMP)
June 5, 2023 Filing 19 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.) Modified to add filers on 6/6/2023 (KMP).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports: a.) Deadline for Plaintiff: 5/1/2023; b.) Deadline for Defendant: 8/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 3/15/2023. (KMP) cc: COR
March 15, 2023 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Edward B. Atkins for review: re #17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time. (KMP)
March 15, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Witness List due by 8/7/2023. (KMP)
March 14, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Ford Motor Company Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keal, R.)
December 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company on 1.10.23 at 10:00 am EST by Jodi Brandenburg.(Hay, Richard)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jodi Brandenburg of Service of Plaintiff's Answers and Responses to Ford Motor Company's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Hay, Richard) Modified on 11/8/2022 (JLM).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS and GRANTS the terms or conditions the parties have outlined in the Stipulated Protective Order. [R. 13]. Therefore, it shall be incorporated by reference herein and shall be entered as an attachment to this order with the described modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 11/07/2022. (MDC) cc: COR
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order (Proposed Agreed Protective Order) by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company on 12/13/22 at 10:00 a.m. EST by Jodi Brandenburg.(Hay, Richard)
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of service by Jodi Brandenburg (Hay, Richard) Modified on 9/23/2022 (JLM).
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service by Jodi Brandenburg (Hay, Richard) Modified on 8/16/2022 (JLM).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. 21 days before PTC, counsel file: a. witness and exhibit lists; b. motions in limine; c. transcript of evidentiary depos to be used at trial; d. pretrial memo; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; f. proposed voir dire questions; 2. No later than 14 days before PTC, parties file: written obj to exhibit/witness lists; b. responses to motions in limine; c. responses to motions for ruling on obj made in evidentiary depo; 3. At PTC, parties be prepared to: a. discuss and make stipulations of admissibility of exhibits; b. disclose demonstrative or summary exhibits; c. display to court all exhibits intended to be used at trial, pre-marked; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of technological issues; 4. PTC shall be attended by all attorneys trying case. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/26/22.(JLM)cc: COR
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) (a) parties exchange info required by Rule 26(a)(1) by 8/22/22; (b) Motion to Join Additional Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 1/16/23; (c) supplementation of disclosures & responses as required by Rule 26(e) need not be filed in record; (d) Rule 26(a)(2) reports from expert trial witnesses due - plt by 4/03/23, and dft by 7/03/23; (e) Fact discovery completed by 1/16/23, expert disc by 9/15/23; (f) Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/23; No ext of time granted by USMJ or agreement of parties; (2) no motions to compel nor any other motions re disc dispute shall be filed unless all counsel involved in such dispute have first conferred; (3) parties shall observe the directives in this order re filing disc; (4) no extensions of deadlines set in this order or the PTC Order shall be granted unless an appropriate motion is filed prior to expiration of the ddl & upon a showing of good cause; (5) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/3/2024 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell; (6) JURY TRIAL set for 4/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell, counsel present at 8:30 a.m. (8 days);Matter is REFERRED by random draw to Magistrate Judge (Atkins) for managing all discovery & PT scheduling issues. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/26/22.(JLM)cc: COR,D,JC
July 22, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hay, Richard)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. W/in 21 days, parties meet; 2. w/in 14 days after meeting, file report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/29/22.(JLM)cc: COR
June 29, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Paul Malek: It appears the address listed on your filing #4 Answer to Complaint is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JLM)
June 29, 2022 Attorney Update. Attorney Paul F. Malek for Ford Motor Company added. (JLM)
June 29, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #4 Answer to Complaint (JLM)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Keal, R.)
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (JER)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Garrard Circuit Court, case number 22-ci-88. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5294620), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit -Annual Report, #3 Exhibit -Petition for Probate, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
June 21, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandenburg v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Jodi Brandenburg
Represented By: Richard Hay
Represented By: Rodney Garrett Davis
Represented By: Sarah Hay Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thaddeus Keal
Represented By: Paul F. Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?