Shannon v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mark Shannon
Defendant: Combe Incorporated, Combe Product, Inc, Combe Laboratories, Inc and Combe International LTD
Case Number: 5:2023cv00084
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Mark Shannon, pro se requesting status update on case. Courtesy copy of docket sheet mailed on this day. (Attachments: #1 Envelope dated 4-27-23) (KCF)
April 27, 2023 Clerk's Note: Case transferred has been opened in Western District of Kentucky as case 1:23-cv-00056 re #5 Order. (STC)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action (including all pending motions) are TRANSFERRED to the Bowling Green Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 04/26/2023. (DC) cc: COR, Strike Team and Mark Shannon by US Mail
April 26, 2023 Clerk's Note: Case extracted and transferred electronically via CM/ECF to Western District of Kentucky at Bowling Green re #5 Order. (STC)
March 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Shannon, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope dated 3-29-23)(KCF)
March 31, 2023 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Shannon, pro se. (KCF)
March 17, 2023 Filing 2 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KMP)
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Mark Shannon, pro se. No filing fee or IFP paperwork received. (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 3/15/2023)(KMP)
March 17, 2023 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (KMP)
March 17, 2023 Conflict Check run. (KMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Product, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?